EP2929535 - VARISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2017/41] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For all designated states CNRS (Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Esplanade Nord Place des Corolles 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For all designated states CNRS (Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIATICO, Javier Unité Mixte de Physique CNRS/Thales (UMR137) 1 avenue Augustin Fresnel F-91767 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | 02 /
VILLEGAS, Javier Unité Mixte de Physique CNRS/Thales (UMR137) 1 avenue Augustin Fresnel F-91767 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | 03 /
BERNARD, Rozenn Unité Mixte de Physique CNRS/Thales (UMR137) 1 avenue Augustin Fresnel F-91767 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Brunelli, Gérald, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Brunelli, Gérald, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13801586.2 | 06.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75840 | Priority number, date | FR20120003321 | 07.12.2012 Original published format: FR 1203321 | [2015/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086990 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929535 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2929535 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/38] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2929535 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/22, G11C11/44, G11C11/54, G11C11/56, G11C13/00, H01L39/22, H01L27/18, H01L45/00, H01C7/10 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G11C11/22 (EP,US);
H01C7/10 (US);
G11C11/44 (EP,US);
G11C11/54 (EP,US);
G11C11/5657 (EP,US);
G11C13/0002 (EP,US);
H10N60/10 (EP,US);
H10N60/857 (US);
H10N70/20 (EP,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,US);
H10N70/841 (EP,US);
H10N70/8836 (EP,US);
G11C2213/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | G11C11/22, G11C11/44, G11C11/54, G11C11/56, G11C13/00, H01L39/22, H01L27/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARISATOR | [2015/42] | English: | VARISTOR | [2015/42] | French: | RESISTANCE REGLABLE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 07.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.08.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2013 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | MT | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | IE | 06.12.2017 | LU | 06.12.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | GB | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MT | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06169112 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US2002180006 (FRANZ MARCEL [CA], et al); | [A]FR2954855 (THALES SA [FR]) |