EP2923299 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACKER, Dirk Südtiroler Straße 3 81547 München / DE | 02 /
MARTINI, Ullrich Zeppelinstr. 61 81669 München / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 13801984.9 | 19.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013EP03493 | Priority number, date | DE20121022735 | 21.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012022735 | [2015/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014079561 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923299 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923299 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/50, G06K7/10, G06K7/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/10267 (US);
G06F21/50 (US);
G06F2221/034 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS | [2015/40] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2015/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 11.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2013 | AL | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | MT | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | IE | 19.11.2017 | LU | 19.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.02.2017 | |
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012249296 (SAVRY OLIVIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,17,18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] *; | [X] - LISHOY FRANCIS ET AL, "Practical NFC Peer-to-Peer Relay Attack using Mobile Phones", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH,, (20100423), vol. 20100428:135139, pages 1 - 15, XP061004466 [X] 1,3,17,18 * page 8, paragraph 2 * |