EP2929766 - EXPLOSION-PROTECTED HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Protection Systems IP GmbH & Co. KG Airport Center Schönefeld Mittelstrasse 5-5a 12529 Schönefeld / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Gerhard Zollerwaldstrasse 9 69436 Schönbrunn / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13802535.8 | 02.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP03632 | Priority number, date | DE20121023979 | 07.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012023979 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086475 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929766 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K5/00 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H05K7/20254 (EP,RU,US);
H02K5/136 (RU,US);
H05K5/00 (RU);
H05K7/20 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | EXPLOSIONSGESCHÜTZTES GEHÄUSE | [2015/42] | English: | EXPLOSION-PROTECTED HOUSING | [2015/42] | French: | ENCEINTE PROTÉGÉE CONTRE LES EXPLOSIONS | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007041160 (KEHRET WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [I] 6,8-12; | [XI]US2007285889 (WATSON MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8 * the whole document *[I] 4,6,7,9-12 | Examination | US2004085733 |