EP2932252 - METHOD FOR MEASURING ULTRASONICALLY THE FILL LEVEL OF A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGUIN, Georges 18 Clos des Acacias F-57155 Marly / FR | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13802645.5 | 11.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013EP76169 | Priority number, date | EP20120290441 | 14.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12290441 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090848 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932252 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/024, F01N3/20, G01F23/296 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G01F23/2962 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
G01N29/024 (EP,US);
F01N2610/142 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1814 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN DES FÜLLSTANDES EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT MITTELS ULTRASCHALL | [2015/43] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING ULTRASONICALLY THE FILL LEVEL OF A LIQUID | [2015/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE PAR ULTRASONS DU NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN LIQUIDE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102010035008 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0039] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004007061 (FORGUE JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * figure 4p *; | [A]US5793705 (GAZIS DENOS CONSTANTINOS [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 6 * * figure 1 * |