EP2859788 - VERTICAL LANDSCAPING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plata Orte, Jose Ignacio Calle Barrachi 41 - Pab. 7 01013 Vitoria (Alava) / ES | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Lehmann Novo, Maria Isabel Lehmann & Fernandez S.L. C/Alvarez de Baena, 4 28006 Madrid / ES | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13803660.3 | 06.06.2013 | WO2013ES00136 | Priority number, date | ES20120000625 | 12.06.2012 Original published format: ES 201200625 | [2015/16] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013186406 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859788 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A01G9/249 (EP,CN,ES);
A01G9/025 (EP,CN,US);
A01G9/022 (ES,US);
A01G27/00 (US);
A01G7/045 (US);
Y02P60/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | A01G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | VERTIKALES BEGRÜNUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/16] | English: | VERTICAL LANDSCAPING SYSTEM | [2015/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AMÉNAGEMENT DE JARDIN VERTICAL | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2015 | Translation filed | 08.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 25.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7788848 (KOUMOUDIS SOTIRI [US]) [X] 1-10,14-16,18-23 * abstract * * column 1, lines 14-20 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 10 * * column 5, lines 20-34, 25-61 * * column 6, lines 1-58 * * column 6, line 63 - column 9, line 63 * * column 10, line 5 - column 11, line 60 * * column 12, line 3 - column 13, line 64 * [Y] 12,13 [I] 11,17; | [XI]US2011093122 (KOUMOUDIS SOTIRI [US]) [X] 1-10,14-16,18-23 * abstract * [I] 11,17; | [XI]GB2458904 (WOLFENDEN IAN [GB]) [X] 1,2,7,9-11,14,15,18,20,22 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-33 * * page 11, lines 1-28 * * page 12, lines 11-29 * * page 13, lines 24-32 * * page 19, lines 9-14 * * page 23, lines 19-29 * [I] 12,17; | [X]AT11006U (LEITNER JOHANNES [AT]) [X] 1,7,9-11,14-16,20-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] *; | [YA]US2008000153 (SUGIYAMA NOBUO [JP], et al) [Y] 12 * abstract * * paragraph [0091] * [A] 1; | [YA]WO2011016777 (HOUSING AND DEV BOARD [SG], et al) [Y] 13 * abstract * * page 5, lines 22-28 * [A] 1; | [A]WO2012010792 (CANEVAFLOR [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]US2007199241 (PELESZEZAK PASCAL [FR]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4295296 (KINGHORN MICHAEL H); | [A]WO2010009505 (LEE ALAN SIAN GHEE [SG], et al); | [A]WO2010142000 (JUNGLEFY PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2012066972 (LIN PAUL [TW]) |