EP2858954 - TREATMENT USING FIXED FILM PROCESSES AND BALLASTED SETTLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 181 Thorn Hill Road Warrendale PA 15086 / US | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 4800 North Point Parkway, Suite 250 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWINGLE, Todd 9349 South Sherwood Drive Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | 02 /
LINDEMANN, Timothy 449 E. North Street Jefferson Wisconsin 53549 / US | 03 /
WHITTIER, Michael Casey S73 W26260 Sierra Madre Court Waukesha Wisconsin 53189 / US | 04 /
WOODARD, Steven E. 17 Homestead Lane Cumberland Maine 04021 / US | 05 /
ANTONNEAU, Nathan 11610 W. Martha Drive Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53226 / US | 06 /
BISHOP, Andrew G. 18 Orion Way Windham Maine 04062 / US | 07 /
BACKMAN, Robert 133 West Plain Street Wayland Massachusetts 01778 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2015/16] | 01 /
SCHWINGLE, Todd 1123 Eastern Trail Mukwonago Wisconsin 53149 / US | ||
02 /
LINDEMANN, Timothy 449 E. North Street Jefferson Wisconsin 53549 / US | |||
03 /
WHITTIER, Michael Casey S73 W26260 Sierra Madre Court Waukesha Wisconsin 53189 / US | |||
04 /
WOODARD, Steven E. 17 Homestead Lane Cumberland Maine 04021 / US | |||
05 /
ANTONNEAU, Nathan 11610 W. Martha Drive Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53226 / US | |||
06 /
BISHOP, Andrew G. 18 Orion Way Windham Maine 04062 / US | |||
07 /
BACKMAN, Robert 133 West Plain Street Wayland Massachusetts 01778 / US | Representative(s) | Holzer, Janine Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Holzer, Janine Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland House Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13804261.9 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US32313 | Priority number, date | US201261658102P | 11.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261658102 P | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013187979 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858954 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/14 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
C02F3/04 (EP,CN,US);
C02F9/00 (CN,US);
B01D21/01 (CN,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,CN,US);
C02F11/02 (US);
C02F3/08 (EP,US);
C02F3/101 (US);
C02F1/481 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/5245 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2001/007 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2101/203 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2303/16 (US);
C02F2305/12 (EP,CN,US);
C02F3/082 (EP,CN,US);
C02F3/085 (EP,CN,US);
C02F3/121 (EP,CN,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM FESTBETTVERFAHREN UND BELASTETER ABSCHEIDUNG | [2015/16] | English: | TREATMENT USING FIXED FILM PROCESSES AND BALLASTED SETTLING | [2015/16] | French: | TRAITEMENT UTILISANT DES PROCÉDÉS À COUCHE FIXE ET UNE DÉCANTATION PAR FLOCS LESTÉS | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 12.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5766459 (ADAMS JR CARL E [US]); | [Y]US2008073278 (CORT STEVEN L [US]); | [Y]US2008073267 (CORT STEVEN L [US]); | [Y]US2008314830 (BANERJEE KASHI [US], et al); | [X]US2011147304 (SAUVIGNET PHILLIPPE [FR], et al) |