EP2861768 - CHIP SET-UP AND HIGH-ACCURACY NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genia Technologies, Inc. 2841 Scott Blvd. Santa Clara CA 95050 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Genia Technologies, Inc. 325E. Middlefield Road Mountain View, California 94043 / US | ||
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Genia Technologies, Inc. 320 Logue Avenue Suite 135 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Randall W. c/o Genia Technologies, Inc. 2841 Scott Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Roger 18862 Masson Terrace Ct. saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 03 /
BIBILLO, Arkadiusz 10100 Torre Avenue Apt 144 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
DEIERLING, Kevin P.O Box 826 Pescadero, CA 94060 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
DAVIS, Randall 433 Matthew Court Pleasanton, CA 94536 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Roger 18862 Masson Terrace Ct. saratoga, CA 95070 / US | |||
03 /
BIBILLO, Arkadiusz 10100 Torre Avenue Apt 144 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
DEIERLING, Kevin P.O Box 826 Pescadero, CA 94060 / US | Representative(s) | Teschemacher, Andrea Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Teschemacher, Andrea Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13804403.7 | 14.06.2013 | WO2013US46012 | Priority number, date | US201261660537P | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261660537 P | US201261660543P | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261660543 P | US201361771031P | 28.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361771031 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188841 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861768 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/48 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/48721 (EP,CN,GB,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G01N27/44791 (US);
G01N33/48 (GB);
G01N33/53 (GB)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/631 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | CHIP-SETUP UND HOCHGENAUE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG | [2015/17] | English: | CHIP SET-UP AND HIGH-ACCURACY NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING | [2015/17] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE PUCE ET SÉQUENÇAGE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE À HAUTE PRÉCISION | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 12.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Observations by third parties | 30.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03093494 (AVIVA BIOSCIENCES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 15,42-49 *; | [XI]US2011192723 (CHEN ROGER [US], et al) [X] 7-22 * the whole document * [I] 1-6; | [A]JP2012026986 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2013123450 (GENIA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-22* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007190542 (LING XINSHENG S [US], et al); | [Y]US2010331194 (TURNER STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US2011192723 (CHEN ROGER [US], et al); | [A] - VENKATESAN ET AL., "Nanopore sensors for nucleic acid analysis", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 615 - 624, XP055063148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2011.129 | [A] - ROSENSTEIN ET AL., "Integrated nanopore sensing platform with sub-microsecond temporal resolution", NATURE METHODS, (20120318), vol. 9, pages 487 - 492, XP055181607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1932 |