EP2897389 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROMPT OF SIGNAL COVERAGE HOLE IN ADVANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Gengmao c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2015/30] | Application number, filing date | 13804584.4 | 08.08.2013 | WO2013CN81040 | Priority number, date | CN20121397400 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: CN201210397400 | [2015/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013185728 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2897389 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W24/04, H04W64/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W24/04 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VORABMELDUNG VON SIGNALABDECKUNGSLÜCKEN | [2015/30] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROMPT OF SIGNAL COVERAGE HOLE IN ADVANCE | [2015/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR NOTIFIER À L'AVANCE LA PRÉSENCE D'UNE ZONE NON COUVERTE | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | Translation filed | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6597906 (VAN LEEUWEN GEORGE WILLARD [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * columns 2,5,8,11,13,15 *; | [XI]US2004203607 (SATAPATHY DURGA PRASAD [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0081] * [I] 2-5,7-10; | [I]US2012157164 (LOCKER HOWARD J [US], et al) [I] 1-10* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * | International search | [X]CN1435066 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]CN1708173 (RUIJI COMM EQUIPMENT CO LTD XI [CN]); | [A]CN101394234 (SHENZHEN HUAWEI COMM TECH CO [CN]); | [A]CN101521901 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |