EP2929462 - DATABASE SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/19] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARON, Guillaume 1 allee de la Machine de Marly F-78210 Saint Cyr l'Ecole / FR | 02 /
KORIKOV, Andrei Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc F-92443 Issy les Moulineaux cedex / FR | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Amor, Rim, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Amor, Rim Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne D'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 13805311.1 | 02.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75237 | Priority number, date | EP20120306512 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12306512 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086711 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929462 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/275 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | DATENBANKSYNCHRONISIERUNG | [2015/42] | English: | DATABASE SYNCHRONIZATION | [2015/42] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE BASES DE DONNÉES | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0926608 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [I] 1-14* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0084] *; | [I]US5924096 (DRAPER STEPHEN PW [GB], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - column 12, line 3 *; | [I]US2006026198 (EMERY JEFFREY K [CA], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0056] *; | [I]WO2008024436 (KYOCERA WIRELESS CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, line 31 - page 11, line 31 * | Examination | - Anonymous, "FIFO - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20111124), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20111124013529/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/FIFO, (20200225), XP055671553 | - Anonymous, "Queue (abstract data type) - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20120502), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Queue_(abstract_data_type)&oldid=490303871, (20151013), XP055220384 |