EP2919717 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACET JOINT TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTI Surgical, Inc. 11621 Research Circle Alachua, FL 32616 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Zyga Technology, Inc. 5600 Rowland Road, Suite 200 Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSELL, Robert L 1206 Bayard Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 02 /
BEAUBIEN, Brian P 2093 Fairmont Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 03 /
STASSEN, David W Unit 43 5000 France Avenue South Edina, Minnesota 55410 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Haslam, Simon David, et al Abel & Imray 20, Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13805637.9 | 14.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US70105 | Priority number, date | US201213678535 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: US201213678535 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014078541 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919717 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/46 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
A61F2/4405 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30056 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30113 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30321 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30324 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30795 (EP,US);
A61F2002/308 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30822 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30828 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FACETTENGELENKEN | [2015/39] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACET JOINT TREATMENT | [2015/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE FACETTES ARTICULAIRES | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1424826 (BRUSS NII TRAVMATOLOG ORTOP [SU]) [A] 2* figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2008014453 (SPINALMOTION INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0025] - [0026]; figure 2A *; | [Y]WO2010043028 (KINETIC SPINE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO2011056172 (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * pages 8-9; figures 2-3 *; | [A]US2011208307 (LECHMANN BEAT [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0037]; figures 4, 8 *; | [XI]US2011307061 (ASSELL ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0082] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0114] * * paragraphs [0137] - [0146] * * figures 1-7 * [I] 2-7 | by applicant | USRE36758E | US2009138053 |