EP2928292 - SEALABLE CRYOGENIC STORAGE CONTAINER WITH OUTWARDLY EXTENDING PROJECTIONS AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIMENEZ-RIOS, Jorge, L. 1308 S. Nancy Street Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | [2015/45] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
JIMENEZ-RIOS, Jorge, L. 1331 South Adams Street 12 Bloomington, IN 47403 / US | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/35] |
Former [2015/42] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13805668.4 | 25.11.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US71589 | Priority number, date | US201261734057P | 06.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261734057 P | US201314077707 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: US201314077707 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088859 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928292 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928292 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, C12M1/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A01N1/0268 (EP,US);
G01N1/28 (US);
C12M45/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | A01N1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSIEGELBARER BEHÄLTER ZUR KRYOGENEN AUFBEWAHRUNG MIT NACH AUSSEN HERVORRAGENDEN VORSPRÜNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2021/11] | English: | SEALABLE CRYOGENIC STORAGE CONTAINER WITH OUTWARDLY EXTENDING PROJECTIONS AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2015/42] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE STOCKAGE CRYOGÉNIQUE POUVANT ÊTRE ÉTANCHE, AYANT DES SAILLIES S'ÉTENDANT VERS L'EXTÉRIEUR, ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2015/42] |
Former [2015/42] | SIEGELFÄHIGER BEHÄLTER ZUR KRYOGENEN AUFBEWAHRUNG MIT NACH AUSSEN HERVORRAGENDEN VORSPRÜNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU VERWENDUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2013 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | LU | 25.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1774852 (CAESAR STIFTUNG [DE]) [A] 1,13,19 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0025] , [0026] , [0031] - [0035]; figures 2a-2b *; | [XI]US2009255938 (FUJA TANNIN J [US]) [X] 1-7,13,18,19 * the whole document * [I] 8-12,14-17,20; | [A]US2011143452 (CHE LI [US], et al) [A] 11,12,16 * the whole document *; | [XI] - Anonymous, "CRYOVIALS & Accessories (Chemglass Life Sciences)", (20100201), URL: http://chemglass.brookwood.com/pages/pdf/flyers/CryoVialBro_web.pdf, (20140324), XP055109581 [X] 1-7,13,14,18,19 * page 2 * [I] 8-12,15-17,20 | [X] - Anonymous, "SIMPORT Micrewtubes | BioExpress Online", (20121126), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20121126034237/http://www.bioexpress.com/divinity-cart/item/464300/SIMPORT-Micrewtubes/1.html?, (20140324), XP055109575 [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * the whole document * | [A] - H. CHEN ET AL, "The derivation of two additional human embryonic stem cell lines from day 3 embryos with low morphological scores", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20050609), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1093/humrep/dei010, ISSN 0268-1161, pages 2201 - 2206, XP055109829 [A] 20 * section "hES cell line cryopreservation" on p. 2202 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/dei010 |