EP2865392 - POLYVALENT PNEUMOCOCCAL POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Bioscience Co., Ltd. (Sampyeong-dong) 310, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2019/02] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. Sampyeong-dong 310 Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | ||
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states SK Discovery Co., Ltd. Sampyeong-dong 332, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. Sampyeong-dong 310 Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Jin-Hwan 1-502 Acazon Apt. 101-3(23/1) Garak-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-160 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Ji-Hye 102-603 Humanville Apt. 456 Bukgajwa-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-813 / KR | 03 /
HAM, Dong-Soo 113-505 World Meridian Apt. 600 Uman-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-754 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Mahn-Hoon 205-1703 Daeju Fiore Apt. B-danji Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-902 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hun 108-1904 World Meridian Apt. 600 Uman-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-754 / KR | 06 /
NOH, Myeong-Ju 3-108 Ildu Apt. Seonghyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-763 / KR | 07 /
PARK, Su-Jin 294-2 Yatap-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-856 / KR | 08 /
YANG, Seon-Young 111-510 Sinbimaeul Apt. Gwangyo-dong Nam-gu Incheon 402-709 / KR | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2015/18] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13806263.3 | 19.06.2013 | [2016/46] | WO2013KR05392 | Priority number, date | KR20120065893 | 20.06.2012 Original published format: KR 20120065893 | [2015/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013191459 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865392 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2865392 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2865392 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K31/70, A61K38/00, A61P31/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61K39/09 (RU);
A61K47/50 (KR,RU);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K31/70 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K47/6415 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | POLYVALENTE PNEUMOKOKKEN-POLYSACCHARID-PROTEINKONJUGATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2015/18] | English: | POLYVALENT PNEUMOCOCCAL POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION | [2015/18] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CONJUGUÉS POLYSACCHARIDE DE PNEUMOCOQUE-PROTÉINE POLYVALENTS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | Translation filed | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE GLAXO SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Baker, Suzanne J. GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/38] | 04.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2019 | 12.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.06.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.12.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2013 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | IE | 19.06.2017 | LU | 19.06.2017 | MT | 19.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
MT | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0168128 (AVENTIS PASTEUR [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8* pages 7-9 *; | [A]WO2009000825 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 9, lines 21-23; claims 1-21 *; | [A]CN101590224 (GUANGZHOU JINGDA MEDICAL SCIEN [CN]) [A] 1-8 * pages 1-2 *; | [A]WO2012078482 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, lines 8-35; claims 14-17 * * page 11, lines 10-30 * * pages 10-13 *; | [A] - JULIE M SKINNER ET AL, "Pre-clinical evaluation of a 15-valent pneumococcal conjugate vaccine (PCV15-CRM197) in an infant-rhesus monkey immunogenicity model", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 29, no. 48, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2011.09.078, ISSN 0264-410X, (20110920), pages 8870 - 8876, (20110922), XP028326015 [A] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.09.078 | International search | [A]US5153312 (PORRO MASSIMO [IT]); | [A]US2003147922 (CAPIAU CARINE [BE], et al); | [A]US2004202668 (BOUTRIAU DOMINIQUE [BE], et al); | [A]CN101590224 (GUANGZHOU JINGDA MEDICAL SCIEN [CN]); | [A]US2010316666 (HAUSDORFF WILLIAM P [US], et al); | [A]WO2011151760 (WYETH LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4673574 | US4902506 | US4912094 | WO9014837 | US5057540 | WO9219265 | WO9313302 | US5614382 | US5847112 | WO0018434 | US6113918 | US6207646 | WO02053761 | WO02083855 | WO02098368 | WO02098369 | WO2004083251 | - HARBOE ZB; BENFIELD TL; VALENTINER-BRANTH P ET AL., "Temporal Trends in Invasive Pneumococcal Disease and Pneumococcal Serotypes over 7 Decades", CLIN INFECT DIS, (2010), vol. 50, pages 329 - 37 | - SAHA SK; AL EMRAN HM; HOSSAIN B; DARMSTADT GL; SAHA S, "Streptococcus pneumoniae Serotype-2 Childhood Meningitis in Bangladesh: A Newly Recognized Pneumococcal Infection Threat", PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 3, page E32134 | Opposition | US5153312 | WO0168128 | US2003147922 | US2004202668 | US2006228380 | WO2006110381 | WO2009000825 | CN101590224 | WO2010125480 | US2010316666 | WO2011100151 | WO2011151760 | WO2012078482 | - JULIE M SKINNER et al., "Pre-clinical evaluation of a 15-valent pneumococcal conjugate vaccine (PCV15-CRM197) in an infant-rhesus monkey immunogenicity model", VACCINE, (20110920), vol. 29, no. 48, pages 8870 - 8876, XP028326015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.09.078 | - CHULMIN PARK et al., "Comparative evaluation of a newly developed 13-valent pneumococcal conjugate vaccine in a mouse model", HUMAN VACCINES & IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, (20161214), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 1169 - 1176, XP055410253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/21645515.2016.1261772 | - Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., "PREVNAR 13", Highlights of Prescribing Information, (20100400), pages 1 - 24, XP055410260 | - Duff Wilson, "Vaccine Approved for Child Infections", THE NEW YORK TIMES, (20100224), URL: http://www.nytimes.com/2010/02/25/business/25vaccine.html, XP055410266 | - SAMIR K SAHA et al., "Streptococcus pneumoniae Serotype-2 Childhood Meningitis in Bangladesh: A Newly Recognized Pneumococcal Infection Threat", PLOS ONE, (20120330), vol. 7, no. 3, pages e32134-1 - e32134-7, XP055410278 | - FABIO BAGNOLI et al., "A Second Pilus Type in Streptococcus pneumoniae Is Prevalent in Emerging Serotypes and Mediates Adhesion to Host Cells", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (20080521), vol. 190, no. 15, pages 5480 - 5492, XP055410289 | - ORLANDO CESAR MANTESE et al., "Prevalence of serotypes and antimicrobial resistance of invasive strains of pneumococcus in children: analysis of 9 years", Journal de PEDIATRIA, (20090000), vol. 85, no. 6, pages 495 - 502, XP055410299 | - DANIEL M WEINBERGER et al., "Association of Serotype with Risk of Death Due to Pneumococcal Pneumonia: A Meta-Analysis", CLINICAL INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (20100915), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 692 - 699, XP055410304 | - Pfizer Inc., "Pfizer Receives FDA Approval for Prevnar 13™ for the Prevention of Invasive Pneumococcal Disease in Infants and Young Children", Pfizer Press Release, (20100224), URL: http://www.pharmiweb.com/PressReleases/pressrel.asp?ROW_I%20D=%2017021#.WYHK0flrtgU, XP055411054 | - KRISTINA A BRYANT et al., "Safety and Immunogenicity of a 13-Valent Pneumococcal Conjugate Vaccine", PEDIATRICS, (20100500), vol. 125, no. 5, pages 866 - 875, XP002702850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1542/peds.2009-1405 | - ALLANA J SUCHER et al., "Prevnar 13, the New 13-Valent Pneumococcal Conjugate Vaccine", The ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, (20111200), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 1516 - 1524, XP055411056 | - Selva L; et al.,, "Serotype 3 is a common serotype causing invasive pneumococcal disease in children less than 5 years old, as identified by real-time D26 PCR", European Journal of Clinical Microbiology & Infectious Diseases, (20120700), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 1487 - 1495, XP035064020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10096-011-1468-7 | - Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., "PREVNAR 13", Highlights of Prescribing Information, (201004), pages 1 - 24 |