EP2864999 - METHODS FOR PATTERNING COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVIGALPITIYA, Ranjith 1840 Oxford Street East London, Ontario N5V 3R6 / CA | 02 /
PEKUROVSKY, Mikhail L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
DODDS, Shawn C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13806808.5 | 10.06.2013 | WO2013US44921 | Priority number, date | US201261663097P | 22.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261663097 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013191939 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864999 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, H01L21/02 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/044 (EP,CN,US);
B05D1/327 (US);
G06F3/046 (CN);
H01B13/0036 (US);
H01L29/1606 (EP,CN,US);
G06F2203/04102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STRUKTURIERUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2015/18] | English: | METHODS FOR PATTERNING COATINGS | [2015/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'APPLICATION DE REVÊTEMENTS RESPECTANT DES MOTIFS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 26.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008264903 (ANTON BRYCE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 18-22 *; | [A]US6511701 (DIVIGALPITIYA RANJITH [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 1, line 48 * * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 63 * * column 5, line 5 - column 5, line 34 * * column 6, line 14 - column 6, line 26 *; | [A]US4895630 (AUFDERHEIDE BRIAN E [US]) [A] 9-11 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 42 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 22 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 54 * | [A] - R. R. NAIR ET AL, "Fine Structure Constant Defines Visual Transparency of Graphene", SCIENCE, US, (20080606), vol. 320, no. 5881, doi:10.1126/science.1156965, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1308 - 1308, XP055245238 [A] 1-14 * figure 1B * * column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1156965 | [I] - Anonymous, "Team:HKU-HKBU/Protocols - 2009.igem.org", (20090101), URL: http://2009.igem.org/Team:HKU-HKBU/Protocols, (20160201), XP055246309 [I] 1-14 * figure 8 * * page 3 - page 5 * | [I] - Charles Greenlee ET AL, "Electro-optic polymer spatial light modulator based on a Fabry Perot interferometer configuration", Optics Express Vol. 19 No. 13, doi:10.1364/OE.19.012750, (20110616), pages 12750 - 12758, URL: https://www.osapublishing.org/oe/fulltext.cfm?uri=oe-19-13-12750&id=218996, (20160201), XP055246321 [I] 1-14 * page 12752, paragraph 3 - page 12753, paragraph 1; figure 3a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.19.012750 | [A] - K. S. NOVOSELOV ET AL, "Two-dimensional atomic crystals", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20050726), vol. 102, no. 30, doi:10.1073/pnas.0502848102, pages 10451 - 10453, XP055056814 [A] 1-14 * column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0502848102 | [A] - WANG S J ET AL, "Fabrication of highly conducting and transparent graphene films", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 48, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2010.01.027, ISSN 0008-6223, (20100501), pages 1815 - 1823, (20100225), XP026926488 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 8, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2010.01.027 | International search | [Y]US2012122037 (BRADFORD MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [Y]US2011101507 (AKINMADE YUSUFF HAKEEM [US], et al); | [A]KR20070068909 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]); | [A]US2010273110 (OGIHARA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [A]US6221562 (BOYD DIANE C [US], et al) |