EP2864472 - MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING CELL POPULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celula Inc. 3030 Bunker Hill Street Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENYEI, Andrew, E. 1547 El Camino Del Teatro La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Haichuan 10425 Hunters Ridge Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 03 /
GUNNING, Kerry, B. 12920 Orangeburg Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Yi 5295 Toscana Way Apt. 738 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 05 /
WALSH, Casey 2640 Vistosa Place Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13807189.9 | 19.06.2013 | WO2013US46641 | Priority number, date | US201261662246P | 20.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662246 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013192342 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864472 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C12N5/07, C12N5/10, C12N5/00, G01N33/569, G01N33/574 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
C12N5/0087 (EP,US);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
C12N2533/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | C12N5/02, C12N5/07, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON ZELLPOPULATIONEN | [2015/18] | English: | MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING CELL POPULATIONS | [2015/18] | French: | MATÉRIELS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE POPULATIONS CELLULAIRES | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0157527 (LONZA GROUP AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10,12,14 * abstract * * page 1, line 22 - line 30 * * page 3, line 1 - line 27 * [I] 2,3,5-8,11,13,15; | [I]US2005069572 (WILLIAMS CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [I] 8 * abstract ** page 6, paragraph 99 *; | [XI]US2007238169 (ABILEZ OSCAR J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10,12,14 * abstract * * page 21; claims 10,15,18 * [I] 2,3,5-8,11,13,15; | [XI]WO2012068248 (INGENERON INC [US], et al) [X] 9-12,14 * abstract * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 30 * * page 5, line 24 - line 29 * [I] 1-8,13,15 | International search | [Y]US2003054331 (FRASER JOHN K [US], et al); | [X]RU2306335 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al); | [Y]RU2327479 (UNIV OF NORT KAROLINA EHT CHEP [US], et al) |