EP2865964 - MIXED HELIOSTAT FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abengoa Solar New Technologies, S.A. Campus Palmas Altas C/Energía Solar, 1 41014 Sevilla / ES | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERRANO GALLAR, Lucía Calle Energía Solar 1 41014 - Sevilla / ES | 02 /
NÚÑEZ BOOTELLO, Juan Pablo Calle Energía Solar 1 41014 - Sevilla / ES | 03 /
CERÓN GARCÍA, Francisco José Calle Energía Solar 1 41014 - Sevilla / ES | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Garcia-Cabrerizo y del Santo, Pedro Maria Av. Doctor Arce, 14 Edificio Regus 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Garcia-Cabrerizo y del Santo, Pedro Maria Oficina Garcia Cabrerizo, S.L., Vitruvio, 23 28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13807349.9 | 18.06.2013 | WO2013ES00149 | Priority number, date | ES20120000654 | 19.06.2012 Original published format: ES 201200654 | [2015/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013190154 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865964 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24S23/70, F24S20/20, F24S23/77, // G02B19/00, G02B5/09, G02B5/10 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
F24S23/70 (EP,ES,US);
G02B19/0042 (US);
F24S20/20 (ES);
F24S23/77 (EP,US);
F24S23/80 (EP,US);
G02B19/0019 (US);
G02B19/0023 (US);
G02B5/09 (US);
G02B5/10 (US);
F24S2020/16 (EP,US);
F24S2023/832 (US);
F24S2023/87 (EP,ES,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | F24J2/10, F24J2/07, F24J2/16 | ||
Former IPC [2015/18] | F24J2/10, F24J2/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | GEMISCHTES HELIOSTATENFELD | [2015/18] | English: | MIXED HELIOSTAT FIELD | [2015/18] | French: | CHAMP D'HÉLIOSTATS MIXTE | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | Translation filed | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2016 | 30.06.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2017 | 30.06.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004004175 (NAKAMURA KATSUSHIGE [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,7,13,15 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0022]; figure 9 *; | [Y]US2009133685 (PHAM QUOC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,7,9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062]; figure 21 * * paragraph [0062]; figure 21 *; | [Y]WO2009152574 (SOLAR SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1 * page 19, line 21 - line 35 * * page 21, line 26 - page 22, line 16 *; | [Y]US2007221208 (GOLDMAN ARNOLD J [IL]) [Y] 5,9,12 * paragraph [0028]; figure 6 *; | [A]WO2009126263 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0064]; figure 7 * | International search | [X]US2009133685 (PHAM QUOC [US], et al); | [A]US2012090323 (GONZALES MARCELINO SANCHEZ [ES], et al); | [X]DE10248064 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [X]US2007221208 (GOLDMAN ARNOLD J [IL]); | [A]US5862799 (YOGEV AMNON [IL], et al); | [A]US2004004175 (NAKAMURA KATSUSHIGE [JP]) | by applicant | US2009007901 | US4276872 | ES2351755 | ES2326586 | ES1074545U | ES8306688 | - Y. T. CHEN; K. K. CHONG; T. P. BLIGH; L. C. CHEN; JASMY YUNUS; K. S. KANNAN; B. H. LIM; C. S. LIM; M. A. ALIAS; NORIAH BIDIN, NON-IMAGING FOCUSING HELIOSTAT |