EP2864013 - DEWATERING OF THICK FINE TAILINGS WITH GAS INJECTION AND FLOCCULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suncor Energy Inc. Suncor Energy Centre West Tower 22nd Floor P.O. Box 2844 150 - 6 Avenue S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2P 3E3 / CA | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REVINGTON, Adrian No. 201, 1818 14th Street SW Calgary, Alberta T2T 3S9 / CA | 02 /
SANCHEZ, Ana 17 Westpoint Close S.W. Calgary, Alberta T3H 0X4 / CA | 03 /
BUGG, Trevor 189 HillcrestDrive Fort McMurray, Alberta T9H 3T9 / CA | 04 /
EASTWOOD, Jamie 182 Bird Crescent Fort McMurray, Alberta T9H 4T3 / CA | [2015/31] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
REVINGTON, Adrian 506-105 Loutit Road Fort McMurray, Alberta T9K 2N5 / CA | ||
02 /
SANCHEZ, Ana 17 Westpoint Close S.W. Calgary, Alberta T3H 0X4 / CA | |||
03 /
BUGG, Trevor 189 HillcrestDrive Fort McMurray, Alberta T9H 3T9 / CA | |||
04 /
EASTWOOD, Jamie 182 Bird Crescent Fort McMurray, Alberta T9H 4T3 / CA | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Nigel Paul HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13807783.9 | 21.06.2013 | WO2013CA50485 | Priority number, date | US201261662729P | 21.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662729 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188983 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864013 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/01, B01D21/02, B03B9/02 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
C10G1/045 (EP,US);
C02F1/5227 (US);
C02F1/5272 (US);
C02F1/5281 (US);
C02F2103/10 (US);
C02F2303/24 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWÄSSERUNG GROBER UND FEINER ZUSCHNITTE MIT GASINJEKTION UND AUSFLOCKUNG | [2015/18] | English: | DEWATERING OF THICK FINE TAILINGS WITH GAS INJECTION AND FLOCCULATION | [2015/18] | French: | DÉSHYDRATATION DES RÉSIDUS FINS ET ÉPAIS PAR INJECTION DE GAZ ET FLOCULATION | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 21.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CA2522031 (APEX ENGINEERING INC [CA]); | [X]CA2634748 (RJ OIL SANDS INC [CA]); | [A]CA2689684 (LITTLE MOON VENTURES LTD [CA]); | [A] - STASTNY, G. J., SOME METHODS FOR TREATING TAR SANDS TAILINGS, PART I, LABORATORY APPLICATION OF C02 PROCESS AND RELATED TESTING TYPE X TREATMENT, (19731231), XP055183063 | [A] - OLIVEIRA, C. ET AL., "Kaolin aerated flocs formation assisted by polymer-coated microbubbles", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MINERAL PROCESSING, (20120520), vol. 106-109, pages 31 - 36, XP028406686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.minpro.2012.01.002 | [A] - ZHU, R., "Role of carbon dioxide in densification of oil sands tailings", UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA, (2011), XP055182967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef200203f |