EP2928794 - ROBOT FOR TRANSPORTING STORAGE BINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autostore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2024/28] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Autostore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | ||
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Jakob Hatteland Logistics AS 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGNALAND, Ingvar Stokkastrandvegen 334 N-5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/28] |
Former [2015/42] | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 13807954.6 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75671 | Priority number, date | NO20120001488 | 10.12.2012 Original published format: NO 20121488 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090684 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928794 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928794 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2928794 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP,CN,CZ,KR,US);
B65G1/0492 (CN);
B25J11/00 (KR);
B25J5/007 (KR);
B65G1/0407 (US);
B65G1/0478 (CZ,KR,US);
B65G1/06 (US);
B65G1/065 (KR,US);
B65G1/137 (CZ,US);
B65G1/1371 (US);
B66F9/06 (US);
B66F9/063 (CZ,US);
B66F9/07 (US);
G05B19/41895 (US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | ROBOTER ZUM TRANSPORT VON LAGERBEHÄLTERN | [2015/42] | English: | ROBOT FOR TRANSPORTING STORAGE BINS | [2015/42] | French: | ROBOT POUR LE TRANSPORT DE BACS DE STOCKAGE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 13.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15172286.5 / EP2962962 | EP16166677.1 / EP3070027 | EP18163437.9 / EP3372533 | EP18163439.5 / EP3372534 | EP19199865.7 / EP3617097 | EP19199912.7 / EP3617098 | EP21170319.4 / EP3875404 | EP21187560.4 / EP3922581 | EP21189108.0 / EP3929109 | EP24177814.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2019
28.07.2023
WITHDRAWN Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | 02
22.12.2020
28.07.2023
INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN Tharsus Group Limited Birmayne House Cowley Road Blyth Riverside Business Park Blyth Northumberland NE24 5TF / GB Opponent's representative Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | 03
22.12.2020
28.07.2023
INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN Ocado Solutions Limited Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2019
10.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
02
22.12.2020
16.02.2021
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Tharsus Group Limited Birmayne House Cowley Road Blyth Riverside Business Park Blyth Northumberland NE24 5TF / GB Opponent's representative Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | |||
03
22.12.2020
16.02.2021
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Ocado Solutions Limited Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | |||
Former [2020/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2019
10.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2020/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2019
10.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Gritschneder, Sebastian Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | 20.12.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 07.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T1449/22 | 07.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 21.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 17.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T1449/22 | 17.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 14.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T1449/22 | 14.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 10.06.2016 | Stay of proceedings | [2016/29] | 01.02.2018 | Resumption of proceedings | [2018/11] | 10.06.2016 | Stay of proceedings | [2018/11] | 10.06.2016 | Stay of proceedings | [2017/26] | 01.09.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/26] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2013 | AL | 06.03.2019 | AT | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | IE | 05.12.2019 | LU | 05.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.12.2013 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 05.12.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.12.2013 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 05.12.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 05.12.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 05.12.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04235822 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [YA]JPH10203647 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH11165980 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XAI]US2003229416 (TAI AKITO [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2005077789 (ICAM S R L [IT], et al); | [A]JP2012116651 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD); | [XP]WO2013167907 (OCADO LTD [GB]) | by applicant | WO9849075 | NO317366B | Opposition | JPH10203647 | JPH10299280 | NO317366B | DE102009017241 | WO9849075 | WO2013167907 | NO20121488 | WO2014090684 |