EP2866224 - ALARM DRIVE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKAI, Taiki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5406207 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Yutaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUOKA, Yukihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/33] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
MUKAI, Taiki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., LTD. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi / JP | ||
02 /
ABE, Yutaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., LTD. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUOKA, Yukihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., LTD. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2015/18] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13808508.9 | 19.06.2013 | [2017/33] | WO2013JP03809 | Priority number, date | JP20120142291 | 25.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012142291 | [2015/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002431 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866224 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2866224 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10K9/122, G08B13/00, G10K9/12 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
B60R25/10 (EP);
G08B29/24 (EP);
G08B3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALARMTREIBERSCHALTUNG | [2015/18] | English: | ALARM DRIVE CIRCUIT | [2015/18] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE D'ALARME | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | Translation filed | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2013 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN102445615 (ASTEC INT LTD) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * | International search | [A]JP2011230556 (PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO LTD); | [A]JP2011242698 (PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO LTD); | [A]JP2011109616 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JPH09114467 (MITSUBISHI AUTO ENG, et al); | [A]JPH09147269 (HOCHIKI CO) | by applicant | JP2011242698 |