EP2864430 - ELASTOMERIC COATINGS HAVING HYDROPHOBIC AND/OR OLEOPHOBIC PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ross Technology Corporation 104 N. Maple Avenue Leola, PA 17540-0646 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Andrew, K. 124 Roundtop Drive Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | 02 /
LIM, Zenas, W. 2019 Swarr Run Rd. Building L Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | 03 /
MCLEAN, Andrew 135Freedom Valley Circle Coatesville, Pennsylvania 19320 / US | 04 /
SIKKA, Vinod, K. 115 Dansworth Lane Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37830 / US | 05 /
HURLEY, Michael 1317 Newton Road Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13809987.4 | 14.03.2013 | WO2013US31751 | Priority number, date | US201261663985P | 25.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261663985 P | US201261708760P | 02.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261708760 P | US201361768290P | 22.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361768290 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014003852 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2864430 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D109/06, // C09D153/02, C09K3/18, C09D5/16 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
C09D153/02 (EP,CN,US);
C09D153/00 (US);
B65D83/752 (US);
C09D5/1681 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
C08K5/5406 (EP,US);
C08K7/22 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | C09D109/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | ELASTOMERISCHE BESCHICHTUNGEN MIT HYDROPHOBEN UND/ODER OLEOPHOBEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2015/18] | English: | ELASTOMERIC COATINGS HAVING HYDROPHOBIC AND/OR OLEOPHOBIC PROPERTIES | [2015/18] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS ÉLASTOMÈRES AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS HYDROPHOBES ET/OU OLÉOPHOBES | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA1002256 (BRISTOL MYERS CANADA LTD) [X] 15 * example 2 *; | [X]GB1465495 (HOLLOWAY LTD E R) [X] 15* Example *; | [X]WO8605389 (PRODUCT RESOURCES INT [US]) [X] 15 * examples 1-7 *; | [X]EP0386991 (YARKONY EITAN [IL], et al) [X] 15 * examples I-II *; | [A]WO2010042191 (ROSS TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * claims 79,82,136 *; | [A] - SHANG, QIANQIAN ET AL, "Facile fabrication of superhydrophobic surface via SiO2/", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2013:1045604, URL: STN, XP002753607 [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * | [P] - SHANG, QIANQIAN ET AL, "Facile fabrication of superhydrophobic surface via SiO2/", ADVANCED MATERIALS RESEARCH (DURNTEN-ZURICH, SWITZERLAND) , 634-638, 1922-1926, 6 PP. CODEN: AMREFI; ISSN: 1662-8985, (2013), doi:10.4028/ | International search | [Y]US4716183 (GAMARRA JOSE P [US], et al); | [Y]EP0446391 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [Y]US5312573 (ROSENBAUM JAMES E [US], et al); | [Y]US5658969 (GERACE MICHAEL J [US]); | [Y]US2008081858 (OKAZAKI GENTA [JP]); | [Y]US2009084574 (BALFOUR KIM GENE [US], et al); | [Y]US2009123728 (CHEUNG YUNWA WILSON [US], et al); | [Y]KR100990240B (LEE SEUNG UK [KR]); | [Y]US2012045954 (BLEECHER DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [A] - INTERNET CITATION, "KRATON FG1924 G Polymer.", KRATON., (20090810), URL: http://docs.kraton.com/pdfDocuments/2009100513210435965202.PDF, (20131213), XP055183594 |