EP2863813 - BIODEGRADABLE BLOOD VESSEL OCCLUSION AND NARROWING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V.V.T. Med Ltd. Beit HaPaAmon 20 HaTaAs Street P.O. Box 211 4442520 Kfar-Saba / IL | [2015/30] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states V.V.T. Med Ltd. Beit HaPaAmon 20 HaTaAs Street P.O. Box 211 44425 Kfar-Saba / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDEIS, Zeev 7 Alon Street 4856039 Rosh HaAyin / IL | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2018/25] |
Former [2015/18] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13810252.0 | 25.06.2013 | [2018/25] | WO2013IL50538 | Priority number, date | US201261664222P | 26.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261664222 P | US201261722826P | 06.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261722826 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002088 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863813 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2863813 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/12109 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/12036 (US);
A61B17/1204 (EP,US);
A61B17/12131 (EP,US);
A61B17/1214 (US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61F2/01 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE BLUTGEFÄSSOKKLUSION UND -VERENGUNG | [2015/18] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE BLOOD VESSEL OCCLUSION AND NARROWING | [2015/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONSTRICTION ET D'OCCLUSION BIODÉGRADABLE POUR VAISSEAU SANGUIN | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2013 | AL | 20.06.2018 | AT | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | PT | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | IE | 25.06.2018 | LU | 25.06.2018 | MT | 25.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0172239 (NEOVASC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]WO03020106 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9-11 * page 7, lines 19-32; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003195514 (TRIEU HAI H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0064] - [0065]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2006015144 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0035] - [0036] *; | [XY]WO2006017470 (MERKECHTEN EN PATENTEN NEDERLA [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11 * page 15, lines 16-26; figure 6c; claim 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]US2006287674 (GINN RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0135] - [0136]; figures 8a,8b *; | [X]EP1878391 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-6,9-11 * paragraph [0020]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US2008210738 (SHELTON FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 49-54 *; | [I]US2008221599 (STARKSEN NIEL F [US]) [I] 1-4,7 * paragraphs [0066] - [0069]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2004034366 (VAN DER BURG ERIK J [US], et al); | [A]WO2010022072 (COOK INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1276437 (NEOVASC MEDICAL LTD [IL]) | by applicant | WO03020106 | WO2006017470 | US2006287674 | EP1878391 | US2008221599 |