EP2866265 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITOH, Yu c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Takeyoshi c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Sou c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 04 /
HIRATSUKA, Kenji c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 05 /
SHIMAZU, Mitsuru c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 06 /
KANBARA, Kenji c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13810423.7 | 19.04.2013 | WO2013JP61600 | Priority number, date | JP20120142622 | 26.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012142622 | [2015/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002589 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866265 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/302, H01L21/336, H01L29/12 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/0445 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/046 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/3065 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/4236 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUMCARBIDHALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS UND SILICIUMCARBIDHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2015/18] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2015/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS À CARBURE DE SILICIUM ET DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS À CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2014 | Translation filed | 18.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 19.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007015333 (KISHIMOTO DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1(A)-2(B) * * paragraph [0053]; figures 4(A)-4(B) * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0084]; figures 7, 8 * [Y] 3,7-10; | [X]US2010193796 (NAKANO YUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0109]; figures 2A-2J *; | [X]US2008220620 (KAWADA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 6 * paragraph [0043]; figure 12 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; table 9 *; | [Y]WO2012017958 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 3,7-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-4 *; | [YP]US2012309195 (MASUDA TAKEYOSHI [JP]) [YP] 3,7-10 * paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]EP2357671 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103]; figure 20 *; | [A]JP2005340685 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) [A] 3,7-10 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 10 * | International search | [Y]JP2012038771 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2005012051 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2012038770 |