EP2936586 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, TR | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore Rue du Marais 31 1000 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Umicore Rue du Marais 31 1000 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUT, Stijn Oosthamsesteenweg 73 B-2491 Olmen / BE | 02 /
DRIESEN, Kris Europalaan 24 B-3500 Hasselt / BE | 03 /
BRIDEL, Jean-Sébastien Kwakkelberg 14b B-2440 Geel / BE | 04 /
ZHAO, Hailei 12-6-902 Heqingyuan Qinghuayuan Haidian District Beijing Hebei 100084 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Jing 103-3-4 Kuangyuan Building Lunan District Tangshan Hebei 063000 / CN | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Knockaert, Guy Umicore RDI Patent Department Watertorenstraat 33 2250 Olen / BE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13811439.2 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP76835 | Priority number, date | EP20120198572 | 20.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12198572 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014095811 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936586 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2936586 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/134, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, // H01M4/62, H01M10/052 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H01M4/134 (EP,CN,US);
C01B32/00 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M4/133 (CN,US);
H01M4/1393 (CN);
H01M4/1395 (CN);
H01M4/364 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/587 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | H01M4/133, C01B31/00, H01M4/134, H01M4/1393, H01M4/1395, H01M4/36, H01M4/48, H01M10/052, H01M4/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVES ELEKTRODENVERBUNDMATERIAL FÜR EINE WIEDERAUFLADBARE BATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/19] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2015/44] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE COMPOSITE POUR BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/44] | NEGATIVELEKTRODENMATERIAL FÜR EINE WIEDERAUFLADBARE BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2015/44] | MATIÈRE D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 18.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2013 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | IE | 17.12.2016 | LU | 17.12.2016 | MT | 17.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
MT | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 17.12.2016 | ||
LU | 17.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [ID]US2006068287 (MORITA TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [ID] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0033] *; | [IDA]WO2012000858 (UMICORE NV [BE], et al) [ID] 1-3,6-8,10 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 25 * [A] 4,11; | [I] - Li-Feng Cui ET AL, "Inorganic Glue Enabling High Performance of Silicon Particles as Lithium Ion Battery Anode", Journal of The Electrochemical Society, doi:10.1149/1.3560030, (20110328), pages A592 - A596, URL: http://jes.ecsdl.org/content/158/5/A592.full.pdf, (20140228), XP055104951 [I] 1-3,6,10,12,13 * pages A592-A595 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.3560030 | [I] - CUI L F ET AL, "Crystalline-Amorphous Core-Shell Silicon Nanowire for High Capacity and High Current Battery Electrodes", NANO LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20081223), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1021/NL8036323, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 491 - 495, XP002638568 [I] 1,2,10 * page 492 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/NL8036323 | [A] - GUO B ET AL, "Electrochemical reduction of nano-SiO2 in hard carbon as anode material for lithium ion batteries", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2008.09.032, ISSN 1388-2481, (20080930), pages 1876 - 1878, (20080930), XP025679955 [A] 14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2008.09.032 | by applicant | US2010009261 | US2007254102 | US2012115033 | US2005233213 | US2006068287 | US5204024 | WO2012000858 | JP2002151082 | WO02083555 | - SCHNURRE ET AL., "Thermodynamics and phase stability in the Si-O system", J. NON - CRYST. SOLIDS, (2004), vol. 336, pages 1 - 24 | - BRUNAUER, S.; EMMETT, P. H.; TELLER, E., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1938), vol. 60, pages 309 - 319 | EP20120198559 |