EP2936514 - INDUCTIVE CHARGING COIL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REJMAN, Marcin Beim Wasserturm 14 71332 Waiblingen / DE | 02 /
LOHR, Guenter Jaegerstr. 5 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
MACK, Juergen Lina-Stoehr-Weg 33 73035 Goeppingen / DE | 04 /
KRUPEZEVIC, Dragan Steigstrasse 23a 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13811907.8 | 18.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP77148 | Priority number, date | DE201210112865 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012112865 | DE201210112838 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012112838 | DE201210112877 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012112877 | DE201210112846 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012112846 | DE201310226228 | 17.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013226228 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014096039 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936514 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28, H01F38/14 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01F2027/2809 (US);
H01F2027/348 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVLADESPULENVORRICHTUNG | [2015/44] | English: | INDUCTIVE CHARGING COIL DEVICE | [2015/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BOBINE DE CHARGE INDUCTIVE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2016 | Decision despatched | 23.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2012039045 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * abstract * [Y] 3,8,9,11; | [XP]WO2013046533 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2010238666 (SUMIDA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2015424 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0046] *; | [Y]WO2011032803 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract *; | [A]DE10132847 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |