EP2934479 - CICLESONIDE FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIRWAY DISEASE IN HORSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Balazs Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
AVEN, Michael Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
LAMAR, Janine Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
LANG, Ingo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Balazs Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
AVEN, Michael Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | |||
03 /
LAMAR, Janine Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
LANG, Ingo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13811924.3 | 18.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP77265 | Priority number, date | EP20120199302 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199302 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014096115 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934479 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934479 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/58, A61K31/573, A61K9/00, A61P11/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61K9/00, A61K31/573, A61P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CICLESONIDE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN BEI PFERDEN | [2018/22] | English: | CICLESONIDE FOR THE TREATMENT OF AIRWAY DISEASE IN HORSES | [2015/44] | French: | CICLÉSONIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES CHEZ LES CHEVAUX | [2018/21] |
Former [2015/44] | CICLESONID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN BEI PFERDEN | ||
Former [2015/44] | CICLÉSONIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES CHEZ LES CHEVAUX | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 15.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 19.09.2018 | [2019/27] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007117783 (BRUECK-SCHEFFLER ANTJE [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0066]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2008041370 (RADAU KIRSTEN [DE], et al) [Y] 5-15* claims 28, 32 *; | [Y] - J. DAUVILLIER ET AL, "Effect of Long-Term Fluticasone Treatment on Immune Function in Horses with Heaves", JOURNAL OF VETERINARY INTERNAL MEDICINE, (20110501), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1939-1676.2011.0717.x, ISSN 0891-6640, pages 549 - 557, XP055057584 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1939-1676.2011.0717.x | [Y] - DIETZEL K ET AL, "Ciclesonide: An on-site-activated steroid ( New drugs for Asthma, Allerg and COPD.)", PROGRESS IN RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (20010101), vol. 31, ISSN 1422-2140, pages 91 - 93, XP008089200 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | - Fei, "SUBSTANCE ACTIVITY BANNED SUBSTANCES", (20110404), URL: http://babh.government.bg/uploads/File/Za_biznesa/VMP/2011_Equine_Prohibited_List.pdf, (20160817), XP055296090 |