EP2934611 - SILICONE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mölnlycke Health Care AB P.O. Box 13080 402 52 Göteborg / SE | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSON, Dennis Ekereds Höjd 55 SE-424 56 Gunnilse / SE | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2015/44] | Andersson, Inga-Lill Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13811956.5 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP77518 | Priority number, date | EP20120199049 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199049 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014096273 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934611 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934611 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/58, A61L24/04, C09J183/06 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
C09J183/06 (US);
C09J2483/003 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/58, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
A61L24/046, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
A61L24/046, C08L83/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61L24/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKONFILM | [2015/44] | English: | SILICONE FILM | [2015/44] | French: | FILM DE SILICONE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 19.12.2018 | LU | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5103812 (SALAMONE ANN B [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, lines 35-49 ** column 3, lines 9-25 *; | [X]US2007202245 (GANTNER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12,14,16,17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2008114278 (FABO TOMAS [SE], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0039] *; | [XYI]US8263720 (SALAMONE JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14,16,17 * column 3, lines 31-35 * * column 4, lines 9-16 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 11 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 10 * * column 14, lines 22-28 * * example 11 * * column 5, lines 27-35 * [Y] 13 [I] 9,15 | by applicant | US5948400 | WO2009031948 | US8263720 |