EP2932421 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING TARGET SEQUENCES FOR CAS ENZYMES OR CRISPR-CAS SYSTEMS FOR TARGET SEQUENCES AND CONVEYING RESULTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge MA 02142 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Feng 100 Pacific Street Apt. 11 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
HABIB, Naomi 8 Columbus Ave. Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Martin, Philip John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Gwilt, Julia Louise Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13812449.0 | 12.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US74825 | Priority number, date | US201261736527P | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736527 P | US201361748427P | 02.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748427 P | US201361791409P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791409 P | US201361835931P | 17.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361835931 P | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093718 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932421 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/10 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/1082 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/907 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
G16B20/30 (EP,US);
G16B20/50 (EP,US);
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
C12N15/79 (US);
C12N2310/10 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON ZIELSEQUENZEN FÜR CAS-ENZYME ODER CRISPR-CAS-SYSTEME FÜR ZIELSEQUENZEN UND ERGEBNISÜBERMITTLUNG | [2015/43] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING TARGET SEQUENCES FOR CAS ENZYMES OR CRISPR-CAS SYSTEMS FOR TARGET SEQUENCES AND CONVEYING RESULTS THEREOF | [2015/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET APPAREIL POUR IDENTIFIER DES SÉQUENCES CIBLES POUR LES ENZYMES CAS OU DES SYSTÈMES CRISPR-CAS POUR DES SÉQUENCES CIBLES ET TRANSMETTRE LES RÉSULTATS ASSOCIÉS | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Observations by third parties | 02.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2018 | Observations by third parties | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007016012 (HARTLEP ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2010076057 (SONTHEIMER ERIK J [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0264166 | US4873316 | US5210015 | US5445934 | WO9639154 | WO9703211 | US6603061 | US6750059 | US2009100536 | US7776321 | US7868149 | WO2011028929 | US2011059502 | US20040491026 | US20040815730 | US20090511940 | other | EP2774168 | WO2014065596 | WO2014089290 |