EP2842333 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INTER-VIEW CANDIDATE DERIVATION IN 3D VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HFI Innovation Inc. 3F.-7, No.5, Taiyuan 1st Street Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 / TW | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Jian-Liang No.133, Neipi Rd. Nanjian Vil. Su'ao Township Yilan County 270 / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Yi-Wen 8F., No.66, Ln.211, Yongkang Rd. Fengyuan Dist. Taichung 420 / TW | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstraße 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Montgelasstrasse 2 81679 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 13812470.6 | 02.07.2013 | WO2013CN78631 | Priority number, date | US201261667242P | 02.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261667242 P | US201261744859P | 03.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261744859 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005503 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842333 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N15/00, H04N19/597, H04N19/52, H04N19/105, H04N19/159, H04N19/176 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/31 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/52 (US);
H04N19/521 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | H04N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABLEITUNG VON ZWISCHENANSICHTSKANDIDATEN IN DER 3D-VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2015/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INTER-VIEW CANDIDATE DERIVATION IN 3D VIDEO CODING | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CALCULER UN CANDIDAT INTER-VUE DANS UN CODAGE VIDÉO EN 3D | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 25.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2013188784 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0 31] , [0 71] - [0154] *; | [XY] - JIAN-LIANG LIN ET AL, "3D-CE5.a related motion vector competition-based Skip/Direct mode with explicit signaling", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120427), no. m24847, XP030053190 [X] 10,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] * [Y] 1-9,11-14 | [Y] - MCCANN K ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Test Model 5 (HM 5) Encoder Description", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120130), no. JCTVC-G1102, XP030111031 [Y] 1-9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [5.4.1] , [ 5.4.2] * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Test Model under Consideration for HEVC based 3D video coding v3.0", 100. MPEG MEETING;30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120601), no. N12744, XP030019217 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [2.2.3] * | [A] - G.J. HAN ET AL, "Overview of the High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (20120101), doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2221191, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1 - 1, XP055045358 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [IV.H.3] , [ IV.H.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2221191 | [XPI] - JIAN-LIANG LIN ET AL, "3D-CE5.h related: Pruning process for inter-view candidate", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20120710), no. JCT3V-A0048, XP030130047 [XP] 10-15 * the whole document * [I] 1-9 | [XPI] - ZHANG L ET AL, "3D-CE5.h related: Improved merge mode for inter-view predicted motion", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20120710), no. JCT3V-A0096, XP030130095 [XP] 10-15 * the whole document * [I] 1-9 | [AP] - JIAN-LIANG LIN ET AL, "3D-CE5.a results on motion vector competition-based Skip/Direct mode with explicit signaling", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20120710), no. JCT3V-A0045, XP030130044 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Test Model for AVC based 3D video coding", 99. MPEG MEETING;6-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSÉ; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120313), no. N12558, XP030019032 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [04.3] * | International search | [A]WO2004114680 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A] - RYU, SEUNGCHUL ET AL., "Adaptive Competition For Motion Vector Prediction In Multi-View Video Coding.", 3DTV CONFERENCE: THE TRUE VISION-CAPTURE, TRANSMISSION AND DISPLAY OF 3D VIDEO (3DTV-CON)., (20110518), pages 1 - 4, XP031993767 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3DTV.2011.5877197 | by applicant | - G.J. HAN ET AL., "Overview of the High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (20120101), pages 1 - 1 | - MCCANN K ET AL., "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) Test Model 5 (HM 5) Encoder Description", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16, URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE |