EP3080204 - WOOD PRODUCT OR NATURAL FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL PRODUCT AND USE OF A FORMALDEHYDE-FREE AMINO- AND AMIDE RESIN BASED ON GLYOXYLIC ACID ESTERS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIX, Brigitte Bertramstrasse 19 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
BÖRNER, Frank Heiligenseestrasse 139 13503 Berlin / DE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13814038.9 | 12.12.2013 | [2016/42] | WO2013EP03752 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086034 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080204 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L97/00, B27N3/00, C08G12/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C08L97/02 (EP);
C08G12/32 (EP);
C08L61/28 (EP);
B27N3/00 (EP);
B27N7/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/28, C08L97/02 (EP);
C08L97/02, C08L77/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Title | German: | HOLZWERKSTOFFPRODUKT ODER NATURFASER-VERBUNDWERKSTOFFPRODUKT UND VERWENDUNG EINES FORMALDEHYDFREIEN AMINO- UND AMIDHARZES BASIEREND AUF GLYOXYLSÄUREESTER ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/42] | English: | WOOD PRODUCT OR NATURAL FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL PRODUCT AND USE OF A FORMALDEHYDE-FREE AMINO- AND AMIDE RESIN BASED ON GLYOXYLIC ACID ESTERS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2016/42] | French: | PRODUIT EN MATÉRIAU DÉRIVÉ DU BOIS OU PRODUIT EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES NATURELLES ET UTILISATION D'UNE RÉSINE AMINIQUE ET AMIDIQUE SANS FORMALDÉHYDE SUR LA BASE D'ESTER D'ACIDE GLYOXYLIQUE POUR LEUR PRODUCTION | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US3935504 (GUILLANEUX PIERRE, et al) [XD] 1,10 * column 1, lines 6-36; examples 1-3 * [I] 2-9,11-19; | [AD]US4906726 (CUMMINGS LOWELL [US]) [AD] 1-19* the whole document *; | [AD]DE3935879 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19627531 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [ID]DE10322107 (AMI AGROLINZ MELAMINE INT GMBH [AT]) [ID] 1-19 * paragraphs [0018] , [0069]; claims 5,15; compound VIII * |