EP3099186 - NOVEL TRITERPENE-GLYCOSIDES AS SWEETENERS OR SWEETENER ENHANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AnalytiCon Discovery GmbH Hermannswerder Haus 17 14473 Postdam / DE | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEMS, Karsten Feuerbachstrasse 7 14552 Michendorf / DE | 02 /
KLUGE, Grit Mühlenberg 608 14959 Trebbin / DE | 03 /
JAKUPOVIC, Sven Zeestower Weg 47c 13591 Berlin / DE | 04 /
WALUGA, Gregor Michael-Bohnen-Ring 39 12057 Berlin / DE | 05 /
TSICHRINTZI, Fotini Würtembergischestrasse 31 10707 Berlin / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2016/49] | 01 /
SIEMS, Karsten Feuerbachstrasse 7 14552 Michendorf / DE | ||
02 /
KLUGE, Grit Mühlenberg 608 14959 Trebbin / DE | |||
03 /
JAKUPOVIC, Sven Dilgesstrasse 24 12249 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
HETTERLING, Gregor Steglitzer Damm 44 12169 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
TSCHIRINTZI, Fotini Würtembergischestrasse 31 10707 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 13814472.0 | 05.12.2013 | [2016/49] | WO2013EP75724 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082012 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099186 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3099186 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/30, C07J17/00 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
C07J17/005 (EP,KR,US);
A23G3/36 (US);
A23G4/06 (US);
A23G4/08 (US);
A23L27/00 (US);
A23L27/30 (US);
A23L27/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/602 (US);
A61Q11/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE TRITERPENGLYCOSIDE ALS SÜSSSTOFFE ODER SÜSSSTOFFVERSTÄRKER | [2016/49] | English: | NOVEL TRITERPENE-GLYCOSIDES AS SWEETENERS OR SWEETENER ENHANCERS | [2016/49] | French: | NOUVEAUX GLYCOSIDES TRITERPÉNIQUES UTILISÉS COMME ÉDULCORANTS OU RENFORÇATEURS DE GOÛT SUCRÉ | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2019 | Observations by third parties | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2013 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | ES | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | IT | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | MT | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | IE | 05.12.2021 | LU | 05.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.12.2013 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.12.2013 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 05.12.2013 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4084010 (TAKEMOTO TSUNEMATSU, et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,12-14 * abstract * [A] 10 [I] 4,6,7,11,15; | [X]JPS5786266 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB, et al) [X] 1,2,12-14* abstract *; | [XD]US2011027413 (JIA ZHONGHUA [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * abstract *; | [XD]US2012059071 (MARKOSYAN AVETIK [MY]) [XD] 1-3,5,8,9,12-14 * paragraph [0002]; example I; claims 9, 12; table 1 * | Examination | WO2014146089 | by applicant | US3087821 | US4518615 | EP0242325 | US5093136 | US5266336 | US5601858 | US6986709 | WO2009021558 | US2011027413 | US2012059071 | EP2529633 | - KASAI ET AL., AGRIC.BIOL.CHEM., (1989), pages 3347 - 3349 | - MATSUMOTO, CHEM. PHARM. BU.., (1990), pages 2030 - 2032 | - LEMUS-MONDACA ET AL., FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 132, pages 1121 - 1132 |