EP2912483 - RADIO FREQUENCY BIRDCAGE COIL WITH SEPARATELY CONTROLLED RING MEMBERS AND RUNGS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/36] | RADIO FREQUENCY (RF) BIRDCAGE COIL WITH SEPARATELY CONTROLLED RING MEMBERS AND RUNGS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE (MR) IMAGING SYSTEM | ||
[2023/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2015/36] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUSSLER, Christoph c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
WUELBERN, Jan, Hendrik c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] |
Former [2015/36] | 01 /
LEUSSLER, Christoph c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
WUELBERN, Jan, Hendrik c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] |
Former [2015/36] | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13814619.6 | 14.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013IB59335 | Priority number, date | US201261718219P | 25.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261718219 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014064573 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912483 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912483 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34, G01R33/36 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01R33/34076 (EP,US);
G01R33/3614 (US);
G01R33/3628 (EP,US);
G01R33/365 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (US);
G01R33/5659 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-BIRDCAGE-SPULE MIT SEPARAT GESTEUERTEN RINGELEMENTEN UND SPROSSENLEITERN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM MAGNETRESONANZBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/24] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY BIRDCAGE COIL WITH SEPARATELY CONTROLLED RING MEMBERS AND RUNGS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM | [2023/24] | French: | BOBINE RADIOFRÉQUENCE EN CAGE D'OISEAUX AVEC ÉLÉMENTS ANNULAIRES ET ÉCHELONS COMMANDÉS SÉPARÉMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/24] |
Former [2015/36] | HOCHFREQUENZ (HF)-BIRDCAGESPULE MIT SEPARAT GESTEUERTEN RINGELEMENTEN UND SPROSSEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM MAGNETRESONANZ (MR)-BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2015/36] | RADIO FREQUENCY (RF) BIRDCAGE COIL WITH SEPARATELY CONTROLLED RING MEMBERS AND RUNGS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE (MR) IMAGING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2015/36] | BOBINE EN CAGE D'OISEAU RADIOFRÉQUENCE (RF) AVEC DES ÉLÉMENTS D'ANNEAU ET DES BARREAUX COMMANDÉS SÉPARÉMENT POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS UN SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE (MR) | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]EP1279968 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [XD] 1-9,11,13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 2-7 * [I] 10,12; | [XI]US2006033497 (CHMIELEWSKI THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 3, 12 * [I] 11,12; | [XI]WO2006090293 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 5 * * figures 2-4B * [I] 10-12; | [A]WO2009074966 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 2, 4 *; | [T]WO2012143833 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [T] 1-13* figure 6 * | by applicant | EP1279968 | - HAYES C; EDELSTEIN W; SCHENCK J; MUELLER 0; EASH M., "An efficient, highly homogeneous radiofrequency coil for whole-body NMR imaging at 1.5 T", J MAGN RESON, (1985), vol. 63, pages 622 - 628 | - TROPP J., "The theory of the bird-cage resonator", J MAGN RESON, (1989), vol. 82, pages 51 - 62 |