EP2932274 - METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF METACHROMATIC LEUKODYSTROPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centogene GmbH Am Strande 7 18055 Rostock / DE | [2020/41] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Centogene GmbH Am Strande 7 18055§ Rostock / DE | ||
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states Centogene AG Am Strande 7 18055 Rostock / DE | ||
Former [2017/27] | For all designated states Centogene AG Schillingallee 68 18057 Rostock / DE | ||
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Centogene AG Schillingallee 68 18057 Rostock / DE | ||
For all designated states Pharm Analyt Labor GmbH Ferdinand-Pichler-Gasse 2 2500 Baden / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLFS, Arndt Leibnizstrasse 58 10629 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MASCHER, Hermann Gregor-Mendelstr. 11/2/28 2514 Traiskirchen / AT | [2020/03] |
Former [2015/43] | 01 /
ROLFS, Arndt Kleiststrasse 21 14163 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
MASCHER, Hermann Gregor-Mendelstr. 11/2/28 2514 Traiskirchen / AT | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13815378.8 | 11.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013EP03750 | Priority number, date | EP20120008257 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12008257 | EP20120008293 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12008293 | EP20130001454 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13001454 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090404 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932274 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2932274 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2800/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DER METACHROMATISCHEN LEUKODYSTROPHIE | [2018/51] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF METACHROMATIC LEUKODYSTROPHY | [2015/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA LEUCODYSTROPHIE MÉTACHROMATIQUE | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/43] | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON METACHROMATISCHER LEUKODYSTROPHIE | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2013 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHRISTOPHER R ET AL, "Serum arylsulfatase A assay in metachromatic leukodystrophy: An experience in a neuropsychiatric set-up", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY 1995 IN, (1995), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0970-1915, pages 89 - 92, XP008161838 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section; Table 1; Discussion, 1st paragraph and last paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02871008 | [A] - GRIFFITHS P A ET AL, "Plasma acid hydrolases in normal adults and children, and in patients with some lysosomal storage diseases", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 90, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0009-8981(78)90514-4, ISSN 0009-8981, (19781201), pages 129 - 141, (19781201), XP024784849 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Summary; Materials and methods section; Table IV; p. 138, l. 10 - p. 139, l. 35. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(78)90514-4 | [X] - "The development of an UPLC-MS/MS method for determination of lysoglobotriaosylceramide (lysoGb3) and (lyso)-sulfatide in body fluids and tissues from patients with Fabry disease and metachromatic leukodystrophy (MLD)", The development of an UPLC-MS/MS method for determination of lysoglobotriaosylceramide (lysoGb3) and (lyso)-sulfatide in body fluids and tissues from patients with Fabry disease and metachromatic leukodystrophy (MLD), (20110301), XP055061021 [X] 1-20 * Pages 21-54. * * In particular: Sections 2.2, 2.4 and 2.5 * | [Y] - TODA K ET AL, "Accumulation of lysosulfatide (sulfogalactosylsphingosine) in tissues of a boy with metachromatic leukodystrophy", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 159, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0006-291X(89)90037-5, ISSN 0006-291X, (19890315), pages 605 - 611, (19890315), XP024836620 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(89)90037-5 | [Y] - ROSENGREN B ET AL, "Lysosulfatide (galactosylsphingosine-3-O-sulfate) from metachromatic leukodystrophy and normal human brain.", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY APR 1989, (198904), vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 1035 - 1041, XP055070555 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.1989.tb01844.x | Examination | EP2533051 | EP2743700 | by applicant | - "Metachromatic leukodystrophy", VON FIGURA; SCRIVER CR ET AL., The Metabolic and Molecular Bases of Inherited Disease | - C.E. HOLLAK ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 1288 - 1292 | - R.G. BOOT ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 33 - 39 | - GROENER ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (200801), vol. 1781, no. 1-2, pages 72 - 8 | - ROSENGREN B; FREDMAN P; MÅNSSON JE; SVENNERHOLM L., J NEUROCHEM., (198904), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 1035 - 41 | - GROENER ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2007), vol. 1781, no. 2908, pages 72 - 78 | - TODA K. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1989), vol. 159, no. 2, pages 605 - 611 | - J.E.M. GROENER ET AL., CLIN.CHERN., (2007), vol. 53, pages 742 - 747 | - T. TAKETOMI ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 120, pages 573 - 579 | - GREEN, J.R., Statistical Treatment of Experimental Data, ELSEVIER, (1977), page 210 FF | - SEEMAN, N. C., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, pages 1194 - 1200 | - N.C. SEEMAN, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 673 - 682 | - N.C. SEEMAN, "Structural Domains of DNA Mesojunctions", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 920 - 929 | - N.C. SEEMAN, THE CHEMICAL INTELLIGENCER, (1995), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 38 - 47 | - N.C. SEEMAN, JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1995), pages 2249 - 2250 | - DELONG E.R.; DELONG D.M.; CLARKE-PEARSON D.L., BIOMETRICS, (1988), vol. 44, pages 837 - 45 | - METZ C.E., SEMIN NUCL MED, (1978), vol. 8, pages 283 - 98 | - ZWEIG M.H.; CAMPBELL G., CLIN CHEM, (1993), vol. 39, pages 561 - 77 | - GIESELMANN, PROC. NATAL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, no. 23, pages 9436 - 40 | - BARONICA, COLL ANTROPOL., (201101), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 11 - 6 | - RICKETTES, AM J MED GENET., (1996), vol. 67, no. 4, pages 387 - 92 |