EP2934900 - LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
READ, Simon c/o Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Brand, Thomas Louis TL Brand & Co 17 Hanover Square London W1S 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 13815808.4 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013GB53368 | Priority number, date | GB20120022961 | 19.12.2012 Original published format: GB 201222961 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014096837 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2934900 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/28, G09F3/02, B41M5/323 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
B41M5/28 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (US);
B41M5/337 (US);
B41M5/465 (US);
C09D133/00 (US);
G09F3/0291 (US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M5/284 (EP,US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US);
C01P2004/60 (US);
C09C1/00 (US);
G09F2003/0201 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | ETIKETT | [2015/44] | English: | LABEL | [2015/44] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9731356 (MOORE USA INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * page 1, line 5 - page 11, line 27; figure 5 *; | [A]WO0052080 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 1-34* page 5, line 20 - page 31, line 11 *; | [XAI]US6830795 (DOWNS GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14,20,29-34 * column 1, line 64 - column 6, line 55 * [A] 7-13,15-19,21-28 [I] 4; | [XDI]WO2010112940 (DATALASE LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 1-7,21-26,29,32,34 * page 1, line 25 - page 31, line 16 * [I] 12-19,30,31,33; | [XAI]US2011061802 (RAMING BRUCE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14,20,29-34 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0080]; figures 5,10 * [A] 7-13,15-19,21-28 [I] 4; | [XI]US2011146912 (HOWARTH M SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,14,20,21,29-34 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0209]; figure 12 * * claims 1-34 * [I] 4,8-13,15-19,22-28 |