EP2871608 - MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Sungje 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seungman 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Jeongeun 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13816107.0 | 04.07.2013 | WO2013KR05957 | Priority number, date | US201261669497P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669497 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014010874 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871608 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q50/10, G08G1/0969, H04L12/28, H04W8/00, H04W8/24, H04W4/00, H04W4/02, G01C21/36 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (KR);
G01C21/362 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04L12/2823 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/024 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W8/005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | G06Q30/06, G06Q50/10, G08G1/0969 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2015/20] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME | [2015/20] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2015 | Translation filed | 03.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 08.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/51] | 12.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.01.2019 | 10.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007152048 (JUNG HEE W [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 3, paragraph 51 * * figures 1,8 *; | [I]US2008228600 (TREYZ G VICTOR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 6, paragraphs 155-157 * * pages 7-8, paragraph 177 * * page 13, paragraph 240 * * page 19, paragraphs 304-305 * * pages 25-26, paragraphs 389-390 * * page 29, paragraphs 432-433 ** figures 2,2,42, 43 *; | [I]US2009171574 (ISHIBASHI ISAO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 18 * * page 3, paragraph 41 * * figure - * | International search | [Y]JP2002083153 (DENSO CORP); | [A]KR20070071420 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR100776201B (GS HOME SHOPPING INC.); | [Y]KR101136226B (SEOWON INTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120055007 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |