EP2870793 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR TRAFFIC INDICATION MAP SEGMENTATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln. Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13816324.1 | 29.06.2013 | WO2013US48808 | Priority number, date | US201261669498P | 09.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669498 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011421 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870793 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02, H04B7/24 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
H04W68/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04W28/065 (US);
H04W28/0205 (KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN ZUR SEGMENTIERUNG VON VERKEHRSANZEIGEKARTEN IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN | [2015/20] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR TRAFFIC INDICATION MAP SEGMENTATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2015/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS POUR SEGMENTATION DE CARTE D'INDICATION DE TRAFIC DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.11.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 23.11.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.02.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 12.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 12.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A] - MINYOUNG PARK ET AL., "TGah Efficient TIM Encoding", IEEE 802.11-12/388R2, (20120514), pages 5-12 - 24-25, XP068038761 | [A] - MINYOUNG PARK, "Proposed Specification Framework for TGah", IEEE 802.11-11/1 137R9, (20120517), pages 15 - 17, XP002713740 | [A] - MINYOUNG PARK ET AL., "TGah TIM Operation", IEEE 802.11-12/117R0, (20120116), pages 1 - 7, XP055176666 | [A] - ZHONGYI JIN ET AL., "TIM Enhancement With Group Bits", IEEE 802.11-12/0325R0, (20120312), pages 1 - 10, XP068038637 | [A] - HAIGUANG WANG ET AL., "TIM Compression", IEEE 802.11-12/0370R2, (20110311), pages 1 - 9, XP055176663 |