EP2872422 - SQUEEZABLE BOTTLE INCLUDING AN ORNAMENTAL FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.J. Heinz Company Brands LLC One PPG Place Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states H.J. Heinz Company One PPG Place, Suite 3100 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYANT, Michael P. 7014 Oak Park Drive Gibsonia, Pennsylvania 15044 / US | 02 /
MCMAHON, Michael D. 2316 Cassidy Drive Bethel Park, Pennsylvania 15102 / US | 03 /
NUKUTO, George Ikuya 124 Drake Drive Wexford, Pennsylvania 15090 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13816716.8 | 13.03.2013 | WO2013US30713 | Priority number, date | US201261671485P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671485 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011223 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872422 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/32 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
B65D23/102 (EP,CN,US);
B65D1/0223 (US);
B65D1/32 (EP,CN,US);
B65D47/0804 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2203/00 (US);
B65D2501/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B65D90/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | QUETSCHFLASCHE MIT DEKORATIVEM MERKMAL | [2015/21] | English: | SQUEEZABLE BOTTLE INCLUDING AN ORNAMENTAL FEATURE | [2015/21] | French: | BOUTEILLE COMPRESSIBLE COMPRENANT UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE ORNEMENTALE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 17.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005139572 (PEDMO MARC A [US], et al) [A] 3,7,10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]EP1873068 (HEINZ CO H J [US]) [Y] 4,11 * figure - *[A] 3,7,10; | [X]JP2011105360 (KAO CORP) [X] 1,2,5-9 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2011121604 (KAO CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 4,11; | [P]EP2502851 (KAO CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [P]EP2511195 (KAO CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US2009159603 (LILICO DAVID [CA]); | [A]US2010059532 (HEISNER DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]US7810664 (TRUDE GREGORY [US]); | [Y]US8016162 (CLEARY WAYNE C [US], et al); | [A]USD653116S (MCMAHON MICHAEL [US], et al) |