EP2854584 - PROTECTIVE HELMET FOR MITIGATION OF LINEAR AND ROTATIONAL ACCELERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apex Biomedical Company LLC P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTLANG, Michael 12346 SE Cougar Place Happy Valley, OR 97086 / US | 02 /
MADEY, Steven 25960 SW Pete's Mtn Road West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 03 /
DAU, Nathan 1020 Hull St. Innovation Lab Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | 04 /
HANSEN, Kirk 1226 Russel St., Apt. A Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | 05 /
WACKYM, Ashton 1310 NW Naito Parkway, M804 Portland, OR 97209 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/22] | 01 /
BOTTLANG, Michael P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | ||
02 /
MADEY, Steven 25960 SW Pete's Mtn Road West Linn, OR 97068 / US | |||
03 /
DAU, Nathan P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
04 /
HANSEN, Kirk 1226 Russel St., Apt. A Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | |||
05 /
WACKYM, Ashton P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
Former [2015/20] | 01 /
BOTTLANG, Michael P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | ||
02 /
MADEY, Steven P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
03 /
DAU, Nathan P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
04 /
HANSEN, Kirk 1226 Russel St., Apt. A Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | |||
05 /
WACKYM, Ashton P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
Former [2015/15] | 01 /
BOTTLANG, Michael P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | ||
02 /
MADEY, Steven P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
03 /
DAU, Nathan P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
04 /
HANSEN, Kirk P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | |||
05 /
WACKYM, Ashton P.O. Box 28101 Portland, OR 97228 / US | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13816787.9 | 10.07.2013 | WO2013US49968 | Priority number, date | US201261670258P | 11.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261670258 P | US201313803962 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313803962 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011802 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854584 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/06, A42B3/12 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A42B3/064 (EP,CN,US);
A42B3/125 (CN,US);
A42B3/065 (US);
A42B3/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | SCHUTZHELM ZUR ABSCHWÄCHUNG VON LINEAREN UND DREHBESCHLEUNIGUNGEN | [2015/15] | English: | PROTECTIVE HELMET FOR MITIGATION OF LINEAR AND ROTATIONAL ACCELERATION | [2015/15] | French: | CASQUE DE PROTECTION POUR ATTÉNUER UNE ACCÉLÉRATION LINÉAIRE ET ROTATIVE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 30.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3999220 (KELTNER RAYMOND O) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 17 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2011139224 (MIPS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012109381 (INNOVATION DYNAMICS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,12,13 * paragraph [0044] * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US6065158 (RUSH III GUS A [US]); | [A]WO0145526 (VON HOLST HANS [SE], et al); | [A]US6387200 (ASHMEAD MICHAEL [GB], et al); | [A]WO2007042930 (LEATT CHRISTOPHER JAMES [ZA]); | [X]WO2011139224 (MIPS AB [SE], et al); | [Y]WO2011148146 (KRANIUM HEADWEAR LTD [GB], et al) |