EP2874407 - AUDIO EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Takashi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd IP Management Department 7 F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Suguru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd IP Management Department 7 F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TADA, Naoto c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd IP Management Department 7 F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 13817160.8 | 30.01.2013 | WO2013JP00500 | Priority number, date | JP20120154257 | 10.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012154257 | [2015/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014010138 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874407 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02, C08K3/00, C08L67/04, C08L101/16, // H04R1/28 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H04R1/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K3/40 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,US);
C08K5/19 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
G10K15/00 (US);
C08L2201/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/40, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/103, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/19, C08L67/04 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2015/21] | H04R1/02, C08K3/00, C08L67/04, C08L101/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | AUDIOAUSRÜSTUNG | [2015/21] | English: | AUDIO EQUIPMENT | [2015/21] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT AUDIO | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2015 | Translation filed | 10.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 21.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]JP2004186915 (SONY CORP) [XD] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-4; | [A]US2007260019 (OHME HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 2-4* paragraphs [0107] , [ 0274] - [0279] - [ 0281] * | International search | [Y]JPH05112726 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]JPH05202278 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2004186915 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JPH06169498 | JP2004186915 | - SERIZAWA ET AL., "Development of Kenaf-Fiber-Reinforced Poly(lactic acids", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF POLYMER PROCESSING, (2003), pages 161 - 162 |