EP2871741 - POWER MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Yasushi c/o KYOCERA Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13817348.9 | 09.07.2013 | WO2013JP68789 | Priority number, date | JP20120153828 | 09.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012153828 | [2015/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014010609 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871741 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J13/00, H02J3/14, H02J3/32, H02J3/38, H02J3/46 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/383 (CN);
H02J3/14 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/387 (CN);
H02J3/46 (EP,CN,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/30 (EP,US);
H02J2310/14 (EP,CN,US);
H02J2310/64 (EP,CN,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E70/30 (CN,US);
Y04S20/222 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | H02J3/00, H02J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/20] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2015/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | Translation filed | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 10.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4181950 (CARTER WOODWARD C II [US]) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH0946901 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008]; figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2007195392 (FUJI ELECTRIC RETAIL SYSTEMS) [Y] 3,6,7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0031] - [0035]; figures 2,3,4 *; | [XAY]JP2009165320 (TOKO ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,8,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0015] - [0038]; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 5 [Y] 3,6,7,9 | International search | [Y]JPH0946901 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2005261050 (NTT DATA CORP); | [Y]JP2007195392 (FUJI ELECTRIC RETAIL SYSTEMS); | [X]JP2009165320 (TOKO ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JPH10198875 |