EP2935318 - NOVEL GLP-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS WITH CHOLESTEROL EFFLUX ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THØGERSEN, Henning Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
TORNØE, Christian Wenzel Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
ROLIN, Bidda Charlotte Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
KODRA, János Tibor Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 05 /
RASMUSSEN, Salka Elbøl Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 06 /
LAU, Jesper Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13818736.4 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP77357 | Priority number, date | EP20120198295 | 19.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12198295 | US201261740469P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740469 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014096179 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2935318 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/605 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE GLP-1-REZEPTORAGONISTEN MIT CHOLESTERINEFFLUXWIRKUNG | [2015/44] | English: | NOVEL GLP-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS WITH CHOLESTEROL EFFLUX ACTIVITY | [2015/44] | French: | NOUVEAUX AGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS À LA GLP-1 AVEC ACTIVITÉ D'EFFLUX DU CHOLESTÉROL | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008101017 (INDIANA UNVERSITY RES AND TECH [US], et al) [X] 8,10 * sequences 500-501, 494-495, 488-489 * [Y] 1-7,9,11-19; | [XY]EP1359159 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR]) [X] 8,10 * paragraph [0006] * [Y] 1-7,9,11-19; | [X]WO9929336 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [X] 7 * sequence 1 *; | [X]WO2011088837 (ZEALAND PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [X] 7 * sequences 154, 200 *; | [X]WO03011892 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [X] 7 * sequence 11 *; | [Y]US2005202532 (BIELICKI JOHN K [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0009] *; | [XPY]WO2013164483 (ZEALAND PHARMA AS [DK]) [XP] 7 * sequence 27 * [Y] 1-6,8-19; | [X]WO2011136361 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO [JP], et al) [X] 7 * sequence 32 *; | [X]WO2010096052 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 7 * sequence 57 *; | [X]WO2011134471 (ZEALAND PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [X] 7 * sequence 71 * | [Y] - S. RUNGE ET AL, "Crystal Structure of the Ligand-bound Glucagon-like Peptide-1 Receptor Extracellular Domain", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20080303), vol. 283, no. 17, doi:10.1074/jbc.M708740200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 11340 - 11347, XP055060531 [Y] 1-19 * page 11340, column l, lines 15-17, 18-20; figure 2 * * page 11343, column l, lines 1-4, 14-16 * * page 11343, column r, lines 43-45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M708740200 | [Y] - C. R. UNDERWOOD ET AL, "Crystal Structure of Glucagon-like Peptide-1 in Complex with the Extracellular Domain of the Glucagon-like Peptide-1 Receptor", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100101), vol. 285, no. 1, doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.033829, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 723 - 730, XP055060541 [Y] 1-19 * page 723, column l, line 19 * * page 724, column l, paragraphs 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.033829 | [XY] - J. Z. DONG ET AL, "Discovery and characterization of taspoglutide, a novel analogue of human glucagon-like peptide-1, engineered for sustained therapeutic activity in type 2 diabetes", DIABETES, OBESITY AND METABOLISM, (20110101), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1463-1326.2010.01313.x, ISSN 1462-8902, pages 19 - 25, XP055049098 [X] 8,10 * page 20, column l, lines 17-20, 26-29, 29-32 * [Y] 1-7,9,11-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1463-1326.2010.01313.x | [Y] - MICHAEL H DAVIDSON, "Cardiovascular Effects of Glucagonlike peptide 1 Agonists", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, vol. 108, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AMJCARD.2011.03.046, ISSN 0002-9149, (2011), pages 33B - 41B, (20110401), XP028249081 [Y] 1-19 * figure 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2011.03.046 | [Y] - "Therapeutic isolated polypeptide, SEQ ID 4.", Geneseq, (20081127), Database accession no. ATO06830, URL: EBI, XP002696081 [Y] 1-19 * sequence . * | [Y] - "Lecithin:cholesterol acyltransferase activation exhibiting peptide #243.", Geneseq, (19990709), Database accession no. AAY18918, URL: EBI, XP002696082 [Y] 1-19 * sequence . * | [Y] - "Lecithin:cholesterol acyltransferase activation exhibiting peptide #4.", Geneseq, (19990709), Database accession no. AAY18683, URL: EBI, XP002696083 [Y] 1-19 * sequence . * | [Y] - "Lipid efflux promoting peptide sequence, SEQ ID 338.", Geneseq, (20080515), Database accession no. AOG45030, URL: EBI, XP002696084 [Y] 1-19 * sequence . * | [Y] - "N965-8 peptide with ABCA cholesterol efflux activity, SEQ:2.", Geneseq, (20100401), Database accession no. AXV23883, URL: EBI, XP002696085 [Y] 1-19 * sequence . * | [Y] - DAN DONNELLY, "The structure and function of the glucagon-like peptide-1 receptor and its ligands", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (20120501), vol. 166, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01687.x, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 27 - 41, XP055060540 [Y] 1-19 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01687.x | [I] - J. K. BIELICKI ET AL, "A new HDL mimetic peptide that stimulates cellular cholesterol efflux with high efficiency greatly reduces atherosclerosis in mice", THE JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (20100601), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.1194/jlr.M003665, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 1496 - 1503, XP055071388 [I] 1-19 * page 1498, column r, lines 1-11; figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M003665 | [Y] - EPAND ET AL, "The amphipathic helix: its possible role in the interaction of glucagon and other peptide hormones with membrane receptor sites", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARDS, GB, vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0968-0004(83)90212-8, ISSN 0968-0004, (19830601), pages 205 - 207, (19830601), XP023569664 [Y] 1-19 * page 205, column m, line 26 - column r, line 13 * * page 206, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0004(83)90212-8 |