EP2875101 - COKE CATCHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lummus Technology LLC 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield, NJ 07003-3096 / US | [2019/17] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Lummus Technology Inc. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield NJ 07003-3096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE HAAN, Stephen 41 Mountainside Dr. Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 02 /
TAM, Peter, Kin-Lee 7 Evergreen Row Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13819522.7 | 11.07.2013 | [2019/36] | WO2013US50013 | Priority number, date | US201213554460 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: US201213554460 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014014731 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875101 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2875101 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/16, C10G75/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
C10G9/20 (EP,CN,US);
C10G9/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D45/08 (KR);
C10G75/00 (EP,CN,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOKSFÄNGER | [2015/22] | English: | COKE CATCHER | [2015/22] | French: | PIÈGE À COKE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 16.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2013 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.07.2013 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4348364 (GARTSIDE ROBERT J, et al) [X] 1,3,6,8 * column 2, line 51 - line 57; figure 2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 15 * * column 1, line 32 * * page 1, line 43 - line 44 * [I] 2,4,5,7,9-20; | [A]DE3217146 (KRUPP KOPPERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5045176 (WALTERS PAUL W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6237341 (KOIKE MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5922192 (ZIMMERMANN GERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US2005261532 (STELL RICHARD C [US], et al); | [A]US2007108036 (SISKIN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2009114567 (MAXWELL JAMES F [US]); | [A]US2011226667 (LOTT ROGER K [CA], et al) | by applicant | US4348364 |