EP2876595 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Takuya c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Daiki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
EJIMA, Satoshi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 04 /
NAKAHATA, Minako c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 05 /
MUSHU, Hiroyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 06 /
SUGAWARA, Tomoko c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 07 /
SEKIGUCHI, Masakazu c/o NIKON CORPORATION 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13820135.5 | 22.04.2013 | WO2013JP02712 | Priority number, date | JP20120160998 | 19.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012160998 | [2015/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014013649 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876595 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, G06T1/00, G07G1/00, H04B13/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07G1/00 (US);
G07G1/0036 (EP);
H04B13/00 (EP,US);
H04B13/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2015/22] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2015/22] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2015 | Translation filed | 18.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 23.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007179851 (TOYOKAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20* page 2, paragraph 27 - page 5, paragraph 57 *; | [I]US2008249859 (ANGELL ROBERT LEE [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 43 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 5, paragraph 61 - paragraph 69 * * page 8, paragraphs 99,100 * * page 9, paragraphs 111,112 * | International search | [Y]JP2007058534 (FUJITSU BUSINESS SYSTEMS LTD); | [Y]JP2009003701 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]WO2009022678 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010277256 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2011150425 (FUJIFILM IMAGETEC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP4273359B | US2010217743 | JP2010277256 | JP2011141730 |