EP2876927 - CORE NETWORK NODE, WIRELESS TERMINAL, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONGESTION, AND NON-TEMPORARY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAI, Takanori c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
ZEMBUTSU, Hajime c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/22] | Application number, filing date | 13820418.5 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013JP03363 | Priority number, date | JP20120161408 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012161408 | [2015/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014013661 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876927 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H04W28/16 (EP,US);
H04W28/0289 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L69/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | H04W28/02, H04W4/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | KERNNETZWERKKNOTEN, DRAHTLOSES ENDGERÄT, VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERLASTUNGSREGELUNG UND NICHTTEMPORÄRES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2015/22] | English: | CORE NETWORK NODE, WIRELESS TERMINAL, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONGESTION, AND NON-TEMPORARY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2015/22] | French: | N UD DE RÉSEAU CENTRAL, TERMINAL SANS FIL, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DES ENCOMBREMENTS ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TEMPORAIRE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | Translation filed | 20.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 12.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011156264 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | [A]EP2451228 (HTC CORP [TW]); | International search | [Y]US2011199905 (PINHEIRO ANA LUCIA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011152050 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2011199905 |