EP2925675 - DEVICE FOR TREATING A FLUID USING ULTRAVIOLET RAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfaa France Chemin du Favier 69230 St Genis Laval / FR | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Alfaa France Rue de la Traille ZI de la Tuilière 01700 Miribel / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIO, Mickael 614 Route de Saint Abdon F-69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
MICHEAU, Laurent Route de Saint Paul F-69620 Legny / FR | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13820794.9 | 28.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013FR52886 | Priority number, date | FR20120061334 | 28.11.2012 Original published format: FR 1261334 | [2015/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014083284 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925675 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32, C02F1/78, C02F1/72, C02F1/74 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP);
A61M1/168 (EP);
C02F1/727 (EP);
C02F1/74 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F2201/3221 (EP);
C02F2201/3227 (EP);
C02F2201/328 (EP);
C02F2201/782 (EP);
C02F2201/784 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP);
C02F2303/18 (EP);
C02F2305/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT MITTELS ULTRAVIOLETTSTRAHLEN | [2015/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING A FLUID USING ULTRAVIOLET RAYS | [2015/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN FLUIDE À L'AIDE DES RAYONS ULTRA-VIOLETS | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 18.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2001321764 (TAKUMA KK) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019]; figure 2 * [I] 3,4,6,8,9,11 | [Y]US2009001029 (DENKEWICZ JR RAYMOND P [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figure 4 * | [Y]US5709799 (ENGELHARD ROLF [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 16 - line 65; figures 3,4,6 * * column 5, line 14 - line 35 * | [Y]US2007248488 (DENKEWICZ RAYMOND P JR [US] DENKEWICZ JR RAYMOND P [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0044] , [0049] , [0050]; figure 2 * | [Y]EP0444530 (WABNER DIETRICH PROF DR [DE]; PETTINGER KARL HEINZ [DE]; WIMMER BIRGIT) [Y] 1-11 * column 7, line 27 - column 8, line 15; figure 3 * | [Y]FR2588548 (BERNARD MICHEL LOUIS [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 23 - line 27; figure 1 * * page 3, line 15 - line 18 * | [Y]EP1260483 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; figure 4 * | [A]EP1247576 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]; ECO LOGY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0037] , [0038] , [0039] , [0042]; figure 5 * | WO9958453 [ ] |