EP2961185 - CONTROL METHOD FOR INFORMATION APPARATUS AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/01] | PROGRAM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PORTABLE INFORMATION TERMINAL | ||
[2020/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takamitsu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAITO, Eiichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2020/10] |
Former [2016/01] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13821050.5 | 30.04.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013JP02879 | Priority number, date | US201361766843P | 20.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361766843 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128775 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961185 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961185 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G08C17/02 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
A47H5/02 (EP,US);
E06B3/485 (US);
E06B9/32 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G08C17/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L67/025 (US);
A47H2005/025 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | H04Q9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG TRAGBARER INFORMATIONSENDGERÄTE | [2016/01] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR INFORMATION APPARATUS AND PROGRAM | [2020/10] | French: | PROGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UN TERMINAL D'INFORMATIONS PORTABLE | [2016/01] |
Former [2016/01] | PROGRAM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PORTABLE INFORMATION TERMINAL | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2014 | Translation filed | 27.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2013 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | IE | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | LU | 30.04.2020 | FR | 04.05.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GB | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.04.2013 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 04.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
IE | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
LU | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7730223 (BAVOR CLAY [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 7,8a,8b * * column 2, line 17 - line 25 * * column 2, line 53 - line 59 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 8 * * column 11, line 30 - line 55 *; | [X]EP2196879 (SOMFY SAS [FR]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, paragraph 4 * * column 4, paragraph 25 - paragraph 27 * * column 5, paragraph 31 * * column 6, paragraph 37 - paragraph 41 * * column 7, paragraph 43 * * column 13, paragraph 95 - column 14, paragraph 101 *; | [X] - Somfy, "Somfy Domotique: Découvrez TaHoma de Somfy - Solution domotique pour piloter votre maison !", (20101105), URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=SkdVsLzOxCc, (20141029), XP054975583 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH08149575 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2002300680 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2009301302 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [A]JP2012231249 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2000138979 | JP2007104567 | JP2009213107 | US7730223 | JP5128489B |