EP3036850 - GEOLOCATION INFORMATION FOR A DVB-T2 STYLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, John Sidney 9145 Doe Spring Drive Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13822018.1 | 18.12.2013 | [2016/26] | WO2013US75954 | Priority number, date | US201361869148P | 23.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869148 P | US201361869143P | 23.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869143 P | US201361882827P | 26.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361882827 P | US201361891563P | 16.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361891563 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026388 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036850 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/51, H04H20/67, H04H60/50 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04H60/51 (EP,US);
H04H20/72 (US);
H04N21/426 (US);
H04H20/67 (EP,US);
H04H60/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | GEOLOKALISIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN FÜR DVB-T2-SYSTEM | [2016/26] | English: | GEOLOCATION INFORMATION FOR A DVB-T2 STYLE SYSTEM | [2016/26] | French: | INFORMATIONS DE GÉOLOCALISATION POUR SYSTÈME DU TYPE DVB-T2 | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 09.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1137209 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * figure 19 ** paragraph [0066] *; | [XI]US2010171660 (SHYR YOU-YUH JACK [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 3,6,7 * [I] 2-6,9-12 |