EP2860960 - STATE MONITORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMI, Takuhiro C/O DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Takahiro C/O TOYOTEC Co. Ltd. 2-35 Nishi-Yutakamachi Toyokawa-city Aichi 442-0024 / JP | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/42] |
Former [2015/16] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13822127.0 | 22.07.2013 | [2020/42] | WO2013JP04432 | Priority number, date | JP20120164971 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012164971 | JP20120164973 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012164973 | [2015/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014017061 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860960 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2860960 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, B60R11/04, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, G03B15/02, G03B15/00, G08B21/06, G03B11/04, H04N5/33, H04N5/235, G01B11/14, H04N7/18, H04N5/238, G03B15/05 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G03B15/05 (EP,US);
G06V20/597 (EP,US);
G01B11/14 (US);
G03B11/045 (EP,US);
G06V40/166 (US);
G08B21/06 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/74 (US);
H04N5/33 (EP,US);
H04N7/188 (EP,US);
G03B2215/0503 (EP,US);
G03B2215/0567 (EP,US);
G03B2215/0592 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | G06K9/00, B60Q3/02, B60R11/04, H04N5/232, H04N5/225, G03B15/00, G03B15/02, G03B15/05, H04N5/238, H04N7/18, G01B11/14, H04N5/235, H04N5/33, G03B11/04, G08B21/06 | ||
Former IPC [2015/16] | H04N5/225, B60Q3/02, B60R11/04, G03B15/00, G03B15/02, G03B15/05, H04N5/238, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSTANDSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/16] | English: | STATE MONITORING DEVICE | [2015/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉTAT | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2015 | Translation filed | 06.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 07.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2013 | AL | 14.10.2020 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005226472 (KOMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,26 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117] *; | [Y]US2008186701 (OMI TAKUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 18* paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]US2008303915 (OMI TAKUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]JP2009071404 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 9-11 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [XAY]US2010254571 (MATSUURA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-15,26 * figures 1, 5B, 7, 14 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0166] * [A] 4,8,16,17,19-25 [Y] 7,9-11,18 | International search | [Y]JPH08241409 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [Y]JPH1078562 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2005301742 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2009071404 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011069893 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JP2011130996 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2012121564 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2005271876 |