EP2889298 - 4-POSITION SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE, AND USE THEREOF IN DRUG PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGXI WUZHOU PHARMACEUTICALS (GROUP) CO., LTD. No. 1 Industry Main Road, Industry Garden Wuzhou Guangxi 543000 / CN | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Shengyong No.24 South Section 1 First Ring Road Wuhou District Chengdu Sichuan 610065 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Yuquan No.24 South Section 1 First Ring Road Wuhou District Chengdu Sichuan 610065 / CN | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 13822476.1 | 05.03.2013 | [2018/18] | WO2013CN72185 | Priority number, date | CN201210264034 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: CN201210264034 | [2015/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014015673 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889298 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2889298 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN 4 POSITIONEN SUBSTITUIERTES PYRAZOLPYRIMIDINDERIVAT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON BEI DER ARZNEIMITTELHERSTELLUNG | [2015/27] | English: | 4-POSITION SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE, AND USE THEREOF IN DRUG PREPARATION | [2015/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE SUBSTITUÉ À LA POSITION 4 ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2015 | Translation filed | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 14.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03099820 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * claims 1, 15-19 *; | [X]WO2005047288 (ARROW THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * example 48 *; | [X]WO2007062805 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP] - LING-LING YANG ET AL, "Structure-Activity Relationship Studies of Pyrazolo[3,4- d ]pyrimidine Derivatives Leading to the Discovery of a Novel Multikinase Inhibitor That Potently Inhibits FLT3 and VEGFR2 and Evaluation of Its Activity against Acute Myeloid Leukemia in Vitro and in Vivo", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20130130), vol. 56, no. 4, doi:10.1021/jm301537p, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1641 - 1655, XP055266067 [XP] 1-15 * tables 1, 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm301537p | International search | [X]CN101351467 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) |