EP2877494 - PTPRS AND PROTEOGLYCANS IN AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Jolla Institute for Allergy and Immunology 9420 Athena Circle La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTINI, Nunzio c/o La Jolla Institute for Allergy&Immunology 9420 Athena Circle La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
STANFORD, Stephanie 9229 Regents Road L209 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/29] |
Former [2015/23] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13823022.2 | 23.07.2013 | [2020/29] | WO2013US51723 | Priority number, date | US201261674853P | 23.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261674853 P | US201261675036P | 24.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675036 P | US201361832688P | 07.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361832688 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014018554 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877494 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877494 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, G01N33/573, A61K39/395, A61P37/00, C07K14/705, C07K16/18, C12N9/16 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | C07K16/40, G01N33/573, A61K39/395, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PTPRS UND PROTEOGLYKANE BEI AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN | [2015/23] | English: | PTPRS AND PROTEOGLYCANS IN AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | [2015/23] | French: | PTPRS ET PROTÉOGLYCANES DANS UNE MALADIE AUTO-IMMUNE | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2019 | 21.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2013 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | LU | 23.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.07.2013 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 15.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]WO2012148003 (SBI BIOTECH CO LTD [JP], et al) [IP] 1-4 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0064] *; | [IDA] - C. H. COLES ET AL, "Proteoglycan-Specific Molecular Switch for RPTP Clustering and Neuronal Extension", SCIENCE, (20110331), vol. 332, no. 6028, doi:10.1126/science.1200840, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 484 - 488, XP055123971 [ID] 14,15 * abstract * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1200840 | [T] - K. M. DOODY ET AL, "Targeting phosphatase-dependent proteoglycan switch for rheumatoid arthritis therapy", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, Washington, DC, (20150520), vol. 7, no. 288, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.aaa4616, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 288ra76 - 288ra76, XP055253889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.aaa4616 | [T] - STANFORD STEPHANIE M ET AL, "Receptor Protein Tyrosine Phosphatase [alpha]-Mediated Enhancement of Rheumatoid Synovial Fibroblast Signaling and Promotion of Arthritis in Mice.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATOLOGY (HOBOKEN, N.J.) FEB 2016, (20160201), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 2326-5205, pages 359 - 369, XP009188793 | [T] - STANFORD STEPHANIE M ET AL, "TGF beta responsive tyrosine phosphatase promotes rheumatoid synovial fibroblast invasiveness", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (201601), vol. 75, no. 1, doi:10.1136/ANNRHEUMDIS-2014-205790, pages 295 - 302, XP009188802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/annrheumdis-2014-205790 | [AP] - STEPHANIE M. STANFORD ET AL, "Protein Tyrosine Phosphatase Expression Profile of Rheumatoid Arthritis Fibroblast-like Synoviocytes: A Novel Role of SH2 Domain-Containing Phosphatase 2 as a Modulator of Invasion and Survival", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, US, (20130523), vol. 65, no. 5, doi:10.1002/art.37872, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 1171 - 1180, XP055253976 [AP] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.37872 | [AD] - Y. SHEN ET AL, "PTP Is a Receptor for Chondroitin Sulfate Proteoglycan, an Inhibitor of Neural Regeneration", SCIENCE, (20091015), vol. 326, no. 5952, doi:10.1126/science.1178310, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 592 - 596, XP055123975 [AD] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1178310 | International search | [A]WO2007041317 (VIRAL LOGIC SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011097327 (JOLLA INST FOR ALLERGY & IMMUNOLOGY [US], et al); | [Y] - COLES, CHARLOTTE H. ET AL., "Proteoglycan-specific molecular switch for RPTP clustering and neuronal extension", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 332, no. 6028, pages 484 - 488, XP055123971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1200840 | [A] - NIKOLAIENKO, ROMAN M. ET AL., "Receptor protein tyrosine phosphatases and cancer: new insights from structural biology", CELL ADHESION & MIGRATION, (20120701), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 356 - 364, XP055190228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/cam.21242 | [A] - MOHEBIANY, ALMA N. ET AL., "Receptor-type tyrosine phosphatase ligands: looking for the needle in the haystack", THE FEBS JOURNAL, (20120705), vol. 280, no. 2, pages 388 - 400, XP055190229 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2012.08653.x | by applicant | EP0003089 | EP0173494 | WO8702671 | US4676980 | US4816567 | US4946778 | WO9100360 | US5034506 | US5143854 | WO9220373 | WO9308829 | US5235033 | WO9617958 | US5530101 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5777085 | US5859205 | WO9907409 | WO9932619 | WO0001846 | WO0044895 | WO0044914 | US6180370 | US6210671 | WO0129058 | WO0136646 | US6329511 | US2002160393 | US2003027783 | US6573099 | WO2012148003 | - COLES et al., Science, (20110000), vol. 332, pages 484 - 488 | - SHEN et al., Science, (20091023), pages 592 - 596 | - COLES et al., Science, (20110422), pages 484 - 488 | - LIEBERMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, (19920000), vol. 1-3 | - "Carbohydrate Modifications in Antisense Research", ECKSTEIN, Oligonucleotides and Analogues: A Practical Approach, Oxford University Press | - LEICHER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, no. 52, pages 35095 - 35101 | - FODOR, Science, (19910000), pages 767 - 773 | - JOHNSTON, Curr. Biol., (19980000), vol. 8, pages R171 - R174 | - SCHUMMER, Biotechniques, (19970000), vol. 23, pages 1087 - 1092 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSONLIPMAN, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - LONBERGHUSZAR, Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19770000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - MARCOS, P., Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (20070000), vol. 358, pages 521 - 527 | - WEINTRAUB, Scientific American, (19900000), vol. 262, page 40 | - MARCUS-SAKURA, Anal. Biochem., (19880000), vol. 172, page 289 | - FRALEY et al., Trends Biochem. Sci., (19810000), vol. 6, page 77 | - ELBASHIR et al., Nature, (20010000), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - TUSCHLBORKHARDT, Molecular Interventions, (20020000), vol. 2, page 158 | - THORPE et al., "The Preparation And Cytotoxic Properties Of Antibody-Toxin Conjugates", Immunol. Rev., (19820000), vol. 62, doi:10.1111/j.1600-065X.1982.tb00392.x, pages 119 - 58, XP001179872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-065X.1982.tb00392.x | - FISHWILD et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 826 - 51 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR et al., Immunology Today, (19830000), vol. 4, page 72 | - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", ARNON et al., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, Alan R. Liss, Inc., (19850000), pages 243 - 56 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SURESH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19860000), vol. 121, page 210 | - MARKS et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 812 - 859 | - MARKS et al., Biotechnology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - WINTERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19910000), vol. 349, page 293 | - MORRISON et al., PNAS USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - MORRISONOI, Adv. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 44, pages 65 - 92 | - PRESTA, Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - PADLAN, Molec. Immun., (19910000), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498 | - PADLAN, Molec. Immun., (19940000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 169 - 217 | - HELLSTROM et al., Antibodies For Drug Delivery''in Controlled Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19870000), pages 623 - 53 | - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE et al., Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (19850000), pages 475 - 506 | - BERGE et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - WANG et al., Nat Rev Genet., (20090000), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 57 - 63 | - MARTIN, Nat Rev Genet., (20110000), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 671 - 82 |