EP2879439 - METHOD FOR SUPPORTING COMMUNICATION USING TWO OR MORE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES AND APPARATUS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Eunjong LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Heejeong LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
CHUNG, Jaehoon LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13823301.0 | 26.07.2013 | WO2013KR06746 | Priority number, date | US201261676312P | 26.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261676312 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014017875 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879439 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12, // H04W88/06, H04W76/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | H04W48/12, H04W48/16, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER KOMMUNIKATION MIT ZWEI ODER MEHR FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2015/23] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPORTING COMMUNICATION USING TWO OR MORE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES AND APPARATUS FOR SAME | [2015/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE COMMUNICATION AU MOYEN D'AU MOINS DEUX TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | Translation filed | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 21.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2012011787 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 2-4,9,10,12 * abstract * [A] 7; | [P]US2013122904 (LEE EUNJONG [KR], et al); | [A]WO2012002771 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0097] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2012050387 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | US2013208662 [ ] (LEE EUNJONG [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0198] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2011120577 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 7 *; | [A]WO2012033774 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * | [XAY] - LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (3GPP TS 36.331 version 10.6.0 Release 10), TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20120701), XP014070533 [X] 1,5,6,8,11,13 * page 95 - page 96 * * page 136 - page 137 * * page 143 - page 145 * [A] 7 [Y] 2-4,9,10,12 | International search | [Y]KR20090034151 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20090039585 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20090088536 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20120003114 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |