EP2877430 - BIOFILM CARRIER SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anaergia Inc. 4210 South Service Road Burlington, ON L7L 4X5 / CA | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSSE, Juan Carlos 26625 Lope de Vega Drive Mission Viejo, California 92691 / US | 02 /
ROLLINGS-SCATTERGOOD, Sasha 6917 Jones Baseline RR 3 Fergus, Ontario N1M 2W4 / CA | 03 /
THEODOULOU, Michael 355 Nunn Court Milton, Ontario L9T 7M3 / CA | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | BSB Intellectual Property Law Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstraße) 59302 Oelde / DE | Application number, filing date | 13823665.8 | 04.07.2013 | WO2013CA50517 | Priority number, date | US201261676131P | 26.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261676131 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014015426 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877430 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/14, C02F11/00, C02F11/04, C02F11/12, C02F3/08, C02F3/12, C02F3/28, C02F3/30 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C02F3/08 (EP,US);
C02F3/2813 (US);
C02F3/00 (US);
C02F3/2833 (EP,US);
C02F2203/006 (US);
C02F2303/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | C02F3/00, C02F3/06, C02F3/08, C02F3/10, C02F3/28, C02F3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | BIOFILMTRÄGERSIEB | [2015/23] | English: | BIOFILM CARRIER SCREEN | [2015/23] | French: | TAMIS À SUPPORT DE BIOFILM | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1717305 (UTS UMWELT TECHNIK SUED GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15* figure 4 *; | [XY]KR100823151B (HANSOO TECHNICAL SERVICES [KR]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]US2011089106 (ARBEL TAMAR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * claims 1-63 *; | [Y]CA2740535 (CALCO ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]US2012152814 (LEAN MENG H [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 9-10 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * * claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US2012164720 (BIERER JOHANN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069] * * claims 1-15 *; | [Y]CN102603061 (YIXING KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL PROT EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * figure - * * abstract * * claims 1-2 *; | [Y] - "Tel Fax Web Address THE ALBION LEACH REACTOR TM", (20100101), URL: http://www.albionprocess.com/EN/albionleachreactor/Documents/albion leach reactor general description.pdf, (20150420), XP055184406 [Y] 1-15 * figure 14 * * page 11, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * claims 1-15 * | International search | [Y]US2011089106 (ARBEL TAMAR [IL], et al); | [A]CA2807881 (ANAERGIA INC [CA]); | [Y]CA2740535 (CALCO ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP LTD [CA]); | [Y]US2012152814 (LEAN MENG H [US], et al); | [Y]CN102603061 (YIXING KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL PROT EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [Y] - XSTRATA TECHNOLOY, "The Albion Leach Reactor", (2010), URL: http://www.albionprocess.com/EN/albionleaclweactor/Documents/albion%201eac h%20reactor%20general%20description.pdf, XP055184406 |